Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Redeker, James A., filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Dickson, Kathryn Burkett, against Does I-X, Pg&E Corporation, represented by Malkin, Joseph M, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArlene T. Borick Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 13, 2008 |
CategoryWrongful Discharge |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions112 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Case Cycle Time140 days |
This complaint is a legal case filed by James A. Redeker against PG&E Corporation and other unidentified defendants. The nature of the case is wrongful termination in violation of public policy. Redeker, a former employee of PG&E, alleges that he was...
DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE
Date: December 03, 2008NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: August 13, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2009 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JAN-16-2009 IS OFF CALENDAR DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
December 03, 2008 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE | |
October 06, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 3.1385 AND REQUEST TO STAY FILED BY DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION | |
October 06, 2008 | Docket Event | FIRST APPEARANCE FEE FILED BY DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION | |
August 25, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF REDEKER, JAMES A. SERVED AUG-18-2008, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON AS TO DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION | |
August 13, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF | |
August 13, 2008 | Docket Event | WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF REDEKER, JAMES A. AS TO DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION DOES I-X SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JAN-16-2009 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-14-2008 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JAN-02-2009 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.