Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Chiquete, Mayra filed a(n) General Labor - Labor and Employment case represented by Pro Per, against Chiquete, Mayra, Reyes, Shirley, Rico, Ignacio, represented by Kappos, Stephen M, Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Robert L. Dondero presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 01, 2008 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions278 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Labor |
|
Case Cycle Time374 days |
MINUTES FOR MAY-19-2009 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 503
Date: May 19, 2009EXHIBIT LIST FOR PLAINTIFF FILED
Date: May 20, 2009MINUTES FOR MAY-20-2009 1:30 PM FOR DEPT 503
Date: May 20, 2009EXHIBIT LIST FOR DEFENDANTS FILED
Date: May 20, 2009NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL SENT BY COURT (206)
Date: February 04, 2009WITNESS LIST FILED
Date: May 20, 2009ORDER STIPULATED ORDER RE: TRIAL EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS
Date: May 20, 2009Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2009 | Docket Event | REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $5,678.22 RE 23454 FOR TRANSACTION W1709511D006 (OTHER TRUST DEPOSIT), PAYABLE TO MAYRA CHIQUETE, DOC #1902219068, WARRANT #38003242, DATED AUG-10-2009 | |
August 10, 2009 | Docket Event | PAID ACCRUED INTEREST EARNED OF $1.90 PAYABLE TO MAYRA CHIQUETE - TRANS W1709511D006, TRUST TAG 23454, WARRANT NO. 38003242 | |
July 07, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
July 07, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY PRO PER | |
July 01, 2009 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT APPELLANT CHIQUETE, MAYRA RECOVER FROM RESPONDENT REYES, SHIRLEY COURT FINDS RESPONDENT SHIRLEY REYES FAILED TO MEET BURDEN OF PROOF. COURT FINDS FOR APPELLANT MAYRA CHIQUETE AND ENTERS JUDGMENT IN HER FAVOR (SEE SCANNED DOC) | |
June 08, 2009 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF INTENTION TO MOVE FOR NEW TRIAL FILED BY RESPONDENT REYES, SHIRLEY | |
June 01, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENTION TO MOVE FOR NEW TRIAL FILED BY RESPONDENT REYES, SHIRLEY | |
May 26, 2009 | Docket Event | PER DIEM FEES DEPOSITED BY APPELLANT CHIQUETE, MAYRA | |
May 20, 2009 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT LIST FOR PLAINTIFF FILED | |
May 20, 2009 | Docket Event | MINUTES FOR MAY-20-2009 1:30 PM FOR DEPT 503 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.