Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Adams Cohen Ventures Capital Llc, Cunningham, James, Freedom Hill Capital, Jt Venture Partners Alleppey Fund, L.P., Jt Ventures Partners Cochin Fund, L.P., (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Kagay, Charles Marriott, Nirenberg, Jonathan I., Resnick, Gerald Jay, against Does 1-100 Inclusive, Gibson, Bill, Gibson, William, Hao, Kenneth, Marren, John, (total of 11) See All represented by Gunn, Patrick P., Hart, Meghan M., Lovett, Robert B., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 01, 2008 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions83 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time698 days |
This complaint is a document related to a legal case in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The document is a request for dismissal of the case with prejudice. The case number is CGC-08-478133 and the filing date is June 1, 201...
DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: June 01, 2010ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
Date: March 29, 2010NOTICE OF REMOVAL FROM THE EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM
Date: March 22, 2010ORDER - STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: July 01, 2009ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE
Date: December 17, 2009ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: December 15, 2009DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT TAYLOR, BRYAN
Date: February 27, 2009DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT HAO, KENNETH
Date: February 27, 2009DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT GIBSON, BILL
Date: February 27, 2009DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT SCHLOSSMAN, ROBERT
Date: February 27, 2009DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT MARREN, JOHN
Date: February 27, 2009DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT MONDRE, GREG
Date: February 27, 2009ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: December 16, 2008ORDER SUSTAINING DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT
Date: October 23, 2008ORDER - STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE DEADLINE FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; ORDER THEREON
Date: December 15, 2009NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM
Date: October 22, 2009MINUTES FOR MAR-12-2010 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 612
Date: March 12, 2010NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: August 01, 2008ORDER AND STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE
Date: September 09, 2009NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM
Date: May 20, 2009NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM
Date: January 19, 2010SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR JAN-13-2010 CONTINUED TO MAR-10-2010 AT 1:30 PM IN 602
Date: December 18, 2009Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2010 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
June 30, 2010 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUL-13-2010 IS OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
June 01, 2010 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
May 28, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | |
May 10, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED BY PLAINTIFF JT VENTURES PARTNERS COCHIN FUND, L.P. JT VENTURE PARTNERS ALLEPPEY FUND, L.P. WINDSPEED VENTURES, L.P. FREEDOM HILL CAPITAL ADAMS COHEN VENTURES CAPITAL LLC CUNNINGHAM, JAMES | |
May 10, 2010 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: JAMES J. MCBRIDE |
|
May 07, 2010 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR MAY-10-2010 - CASE SETTLED. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 212 ON JUL-13-2010 AT 10:00 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. | |
April 30, 2010 | Hearing |
MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: MONICA F. WILEY |
|
April 30, 2010 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR APR-30-2010 - PER REQUEST OF MOVING PARTY, MATTER SETTLED BY PARTIES PRIOR TO MSC.(D.624) | |
April 05, 2010 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: JAMES J. MCBRIDE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.