Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Roth, Jewel, filed a(n) Other Non Exempt Complaints case represented by Feder, Daniel Louis, against Does 1-500, Incl., Na Hoku, A Business Organizaton, Form Unknown, Na Hoku, Inc., Pearl Factory, A Business Organization, Form, The Sultan Company, A Business Organization, Form, (total of 5) See All represented by Arias, Catherine Lynne, Moye, Myron Desverney, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with John E. Munter presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management270 days |
|
Filing DateJune 19, 2008 |
CategoryOther Non Exempt Complaints |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time2343 days |
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: August 12, 2009MINUTES FOR JUL-05-2013 1:30 PM
Date: July 05, 2013MINUTES FOR MAR-01-2013 1:30 PM
Date: March 01, 2013MINUTES FOR DEC-08-2008 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 305
Date: December 08, 2008MINUTES FOR JUN-12-2009 1:30 PM FOR DEPT 305
Date: June 12, 2009ORDER - CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: June 14, 2011ORDER (1) GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL; AND (2) APPROVING NOTICE
Date: June 14, 2011ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT NA HOKU, INC.
Date: August 15, 2008ORDER - AUTHORIZATION TO RE-ASSIGN CASES AND PROCEEDINGS (TRANSACTION ID # 56454746)
Date: November 18, 2014THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT
Date: July 05, 2013ORDER - GENERAL ORDER RE CASE RE-ASSIGNMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 56454754)
Date: November 18, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER - AUTHORIZATION TO RE-ASSIGN CASES AND PROCEEDINGS (TRANSACTION ID # 56454746) | |
November 18, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER - GENERAL ORDER RE CASE RE-ASSIGNMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 56454754) | |
June 13, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID # 55593454) FILED BY DEFENDANT NA HOKU, INC. | |
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DECLARATION OF MARY BUTLER REGARDING FINAL ACCOUNTING (TRANSACTION ID # 55263555) FILED BY DEFENDANT NA HOKU, INC. A HAWAII CORPORATION DBA NA HOKU, PEARL FACTORY AND THE SULTAN COMPANY | |
April 04, 2014 | Hearing | Status Conference Re Completion | |
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event | COMPLEX LITIGATION CALENDAR ON APR-04-2014 IN DEPT. 305, COMPLEX LITIGATION OFF CALENDAR. NO FUTURE DATE SET. JUDGE: JOHN E. MUNTER; CLERK: CRAIG BLACKSTONE; NOT REPORTED. | |
March 28, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DECLARATION OF MARY BUTLER REGARDING FINAL ACCOUNTING (TRANSACTION ID # 55221572) FILED BY DEFENDANT NA HOKU, INC. | |
July 05, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING: (1) FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; AND (2) APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS | |
July 05, 2013 | Docket Event | MINUTES FOR JUL-05-2013 1:30 PM | |
July 05, 2013 | Hearing |
MOTION / Ntc Of Mo & Mo For Order Granting Final Approval Of Class Action Settlement
Judge: JOHN E. MUNTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.