Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Maldonado, Diana, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Moss, Gary Elliott, against Does 1-10, Saint Francis Memorial Hospital, Shanser M.D, John, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 23, 2008 |
CategoryMalpractice - Medical/Dental |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions430 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Case Cycle Time437 days |
This complaint is a medical malpractice case filed by Diana Maldonado against Saint Francis Memorial Hospital, John Shanser, M.D., and other unnamed defendants. The complaint alleges that the defendants were negligent in their medical treatment, resu...
ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANTS TO MARCH 27, 2009
Date: January 30, 2009NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: May 23, 2008ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANTS TO SEPTEMBER 17, 2008
Date: August 11, 2008ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANTS TO NOVEMBER 17, 2008
Date: September 18, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2009 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
August 03, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF AUG-17-2009 IS OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
July 27, 2009 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
July 06, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUL-06-2009 CONTINUED TO AUG-17-2009 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 212 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S), OR FILE DISMISSAL. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
July 06, 2009 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
July 06, 2009 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR JUL-06-2009 1:30 PM FOR DEPT 212 | |
May 04, 2009 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
April 27, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAY-04-2009 CONTINUED TO JUL-06-2009 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 212 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE MAY-04-2009 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
February 02, 2009 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
January 30, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANTS TO MARCH 27, 2009 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.