Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Anduray, Brittany, Brown, Niesha, Campo, Rommel, Cartagena, Rudy, Garcia Sanchez, Vicente, (total of 45) See All filed a(n) Injunctive Relief case represented by Dindial, Ragunath Kautilya, Fox, Raquel, against Carlos Suncin And Dinah Suncin As Trustess For The, Does 1-200, Inclusive, Levinson, Marc A, Levinson, Marc A., Marc A. Levinson And Pete Pattis As Trustess For, (total of 10) See All represented by Cholakian, Kevin Kay, Marshall, Norma S., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with James J. McBride presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 16, 2008 |
CategoryInjunctive Relief |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions516 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time804 days |
ORDER VACATING SANCTION ORDER ON SEP-02-2008 AGAINST RAQUEL FOX, ESQ.
Date: September 05, 2008NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: May 16, 2008ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO A BLOCKED ACCOUNT - RODRIGO RAMIREZ TELLEZ.
Date: June 22, 2010ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO A BLOCKED ACCOUNT - REBECCA MUNOZ.
Date: June 22, 2010ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO A BLOCKED ACCOUNT - RAFAEL GURROLA
Date: June 22, 2010ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO A BLOCKED ACCOUNT - BRITTANY ANDURAY.
Date: June 22, 2010ORDER APPROVING THE COMPROMISE OF A DISPUTED CLAIM OF A MINOR - REBBECA MUNOZ.
Date: June 22, 2010DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO PLAINTIFF HERNANDEZ, MARIA RITA
Date: October 14, 2009ORDER APPROVING THE COMPROMISE OF A DISPUTED CLAIM OF A MINOR - RAFAEL GURROLO.
Date: June 22, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2010 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: JAMES J. MCBRIDE |
|
July 29, 2010 | Hearing |
MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: RONALD E. QUIDACHAY |
|
July 29, 2010 | Docket Event | MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR AUG-16-2010 VACATED. SEE ROA ENTRY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED 6-30-10. | |
July 29, 2010 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUL-29-2010 IN DEPT. 501. DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED. | |
July 20, 2010 | Hearing |
Progress Report Re: Receipt & Acknowledgment Of The Deposit Of Money Into A Blocked Account.
Judge: WILLIAM R. GARGANO |
|
July 20, 2010 | Docket Event | UNCONTESTED CALENDAR OF JUL-20-2010 PROGRESS REPORT RE: RECEIPT & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF THE DEPOSIT OF MONEY INTO A BLOCKED ACCOUNT. OFF CALENDAR - RECEIPT & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF DEPOSIT OF MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNTS FILED ON JULY 1, 2010 & JULY 9, 2010. NOT RECORDED. | |
July 19, 2010 | Docket Event | RECEIPT AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF ORDER FOR THE DEPOSIT OF MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TELLEZ, VERONICA AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR RAFAEL GURROLA | |
July 09, 2010 | Docket Event | RECEIPT AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF ORDER FOR THE DEPOSIT OF MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TELLEZ, VERONICA (ALSO GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR RODRIGO RAMIREZ) CARTAGENA, RUDY BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM CANDELARIO MUNOZ CAMPO, ROMMEL BROWN, NIESHA ANDURAY, BRITTANY BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM PETRONA ROA | |
July 01, 2010 | Docket Event | RECEIPT AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF ORDER FOR THE DEPOSIT OF MONEY INO BLOCKED ACCOUNT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TELLEZ, VERONICA (ALSO GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR RODRIGO RAMIREZ) BROWN, NIESHA ANDURAY, BRITTANY BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM PETRONA ROA | |
June 30, 2010 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.