Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Zide, Flint Corey, against Does 1 To 5, Inclusive, Knieser Jr, Paul J, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArlene T. Borick Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 28, 2008 |
CategoryExempt Collections (Rule 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions246 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time247 days |
DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Date: December 30, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2008 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF DEC-31-2008 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. (212) | |
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR DEC-31-2008 1:30 PM FOR DEPT 212 | |
December 30, 2008 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
October 30, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR DEC-31-2008 IN DEPARTMENT 212 AT 1:30 PM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
August 13, 2008 | Docket Event | CRC 3.740 REVIEW (212) | |
April 28, 2008 | Docket Event | EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AS TO DEFENDANT KNIESER JR, PAUL J DOES 1 TO 5, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-27-2008 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.