Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lexis Nexis A Division Of Redd Elsever, Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Brodkin, Alan L., against Does 1 Through 10, Inclusive, Litton & Geonetta Llp, An Entity Unknown, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 22, 2008 |
CategoryExempt Collections (Rule 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions191 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time253 days |
DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE
Date: October 30, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | CRC 3.740 REVIEW - DISMISSAL ON FILE | |
October 30, 2008 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE | |
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event | CRC 3.740 REVIEW. (212) | |
September 30, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS AS TO DEFENDANT LITTON & GEONETTA LLP, AN ENTITY UNKNOWN | |
September 15, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, AS TO DEFENDANT LITTON & GEONETTA LLP, AN ENTITY UNKNOWN | |
September 15, 2008 | Docket Event | AMENDED SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEXIS NEXIS A DIVISION OF REDD ELSEVER, INC SERVED MAY-06-2008, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON AS TO DEFENDANT LITTON & GEONETTA LLP, AN ENTITY UNKNOWN | |
August 26, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, AS TO DEFENDANT LITTON & GEONETTA LLP, AN ENTITY UNKNOWN | |
August 07, 2008 | Docket Event | CRC 3.740 REVIEW (212) | |
May 07, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEXIS NEXIS A DIVISION OF REDD ELSEVER, INC SERVED MAY-06-2008, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON AS TO DEFENDANT LITTON & GEONETTA LLP, AN ENTITY UNKNOWN | |
April 22, 2008 | Docket Event | EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEXIS NEXIS A DIVISION OF REDD ELSEVER, INC AS TO DEFENDANT LITTON & GEONETTA LLP, AN ENTITY UNKNOWN DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-20-2008 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.