Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
George Ballard Company, A Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Glassberg, Harold Burton, against Does 1 Through 50, Inclusive, Lee, Dong Yuel, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Everett Hewlett presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 21, 2008 |
CategoryExempt Collections (Rule 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions43 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time469 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2009 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, PARTIALLY SATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT LEE, DONG YUEL AKA Y.LEE, INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA POST ELECTRIC CO., | |
August 03, 2009 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT LEE, DONG YUEL AKA Y.LEE, INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA POST ELECTRIC CO., | |
November 03, 2008 | Hearing |
ORDER OF EXAMINATION ISSUED
Judge: EVERETT HEWLETT |
|
November 03, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER OF EXAMINATION NOV-03-2008 DISCHARGED AS TO DEFENDANT DONG YUEL LEE. DEFENDANT WAS SWORN AND EXAMINED. | |
September 18, 2008 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF OEX FILED BY PLAINTIFF GEORGE BALLARD COMPANY, A CORPORATION SERVED AUG-15-2008, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT LEE, DONG YUEL AKA Y.LEE, INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA POST ELECTRIC CO., | |
August 06, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER OF EXAMINATION ISSUED FILED BY PLAINTIFF GEORGE BALLARD COMPANY, A CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT LEE, DONG YUEL AKA Y.LEE, INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA POST ELECTRIC CO., OEX HEARING SET FOR NOV-03-2008 AT 02:00 PM IN DEPT 612 | |
July 30, 2008 | Docket Event | CRC 3.740 REVIEW - JUDGMENT ON FILE | |
June 23, 2008 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT LEE, DONG YUEL AKA Y.LEE, INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA POST ELECTRIC CO., | |
June 09, 2008 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF GEORGE BALLARD COMPANY, A CORPORATION | |
June 03, 2008 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.