Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kahn, Michael D., against Does 1 To 10, Williams, Sylvia, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 08, 2008 |
CategoryCommon Counts/Open Book Account/Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions104 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time497 days |
This complaint document is a proof of service of summons in a case between Capital One Bank and Sylvia Williams. The case number is CGC-08-474016 and the filing date is Jun-05-2008. The document includes information about the attorney representing th...
DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10
Date: July 21, 2008NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: April 08, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2009 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK | |
August 08, 2008 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
August 04, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 HOURS | |
July 25, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-08-2008 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
July 21, 2008 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10 | |
July 21, 2008 | Docket Event | UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT WILLIAMS, SYLVIA $1,610.67 PRINCIPAL, $425.00 ATTORNEY FEES, $229.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $2,264.67, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
July 21, 2008 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT RE: WAIVE DIFERENCE FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK | |
July 21, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 NOTICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK | |
July 21, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT [CCP 585(D)] FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK | |
July 21, 2008 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT RE: WAIVE INTEREST [CCP 585(D)] FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.