Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Woods, James, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ferris, Robert L, against Does 1 To 10, Henderson, Anne E., represented by Bjonerud, Deborah Tomi, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2008 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage - Vehicle Related |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions514 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time542 days |
This complaint is a legal document filed by James Woods against Anne E. Henderson and others. The case number is CGC-08-472242, and it was filed on February 15, 2008. The complaint alleges personal injury, property damage, and wrongful death. The pla...
ORDER TO SET ASIDE/VACATE JUDGMENT JUDGMENT OF FEB-02-2009 SET ASIDE
Date: July 01, 2009ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SENT BY COURT
Date: July 06, 2009ORDER PERMITTING PLTF TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AT THE PRE-ARBITRATION SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE.
Date: October 29, 2008NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: February 15, 2008ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT HENDERSON, ANNE E.
Date: May 02, 2008PANEL OF ARBITRATORS ASSIGNED. REJECTION DATE SEP-25-2008.
Date: September 15, 2008ARBITRATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JAN-26-2009 AT 3:30 PM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.
Date: September 26, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2009 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
August 10, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-21-2009 IS OFF CALENDAR DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
July 13, 2009 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE | |
July 06, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SENT BY COURT | |
July 06, 2009 | Docket Event | ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING SET FOR AUG-21-2009 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 212 | |
July 01, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SET ASIDE/VACATE JUDGMENT JUDGMENT OF FEB-02-2009 SET ASIDE | |
June 05, 2009 | Docket Event | STIPULATION SETTING ASIDE JUDGMENT AND PERMITTING FILING OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY DEFENDANT HENDERSON, ANNE E. | |
April 03, 2009 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
March 20, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-03-2009 IS OFF CALENDAR JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
February 02, 2009 | Docket Event | PURSUANT TO CRC 3.827 (A), THE AWARD OF THE ARBITRATOR IS HEREBY ENTERED AS JUDGMENT. THAT PLAINTIFF, JAMES WOODS RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT, ANN E. HENDERSON, THE SUM OF $14,730.80 PLUS STATUTORY COSTS OF SUIT. SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.