Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Koshes, Veda, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Donadio, David R, Pro Per, against All Asbests Defts, Allis-Chalmers Corporation Product Liability Trust, Asbestos Defendants, Cbs Corporation, A Delaware Corporation, F K A, Does 1-8500, (total of 11) See All represented by Fadeff, Jeffery John, Foley, Stephen J., Jackson, Gabriel Anne, Johnson, Derek S., Mccall, Michael T, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Teri L. Jackson presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 07, 2008 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1877 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time3656 days |
This complaint is a notice of the plaintiff's failure to file and serve opposition to defendant Riley Power Inc.'s motion to strike the plaintiff's complaint. The defendant, Riley Power Inc., has not received any opposition from the plaintiff regardi...
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 23259048) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL DYNAMICS CORP.
Date: January 12, 2009ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 23551971) FILED BY DEFENDANT J. T. THORPE & SON, INC.
Date: January 30, 2009NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: October 26, 2009AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 23514485)
Date: January 28, 2009ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 23297307) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY
Date: January 14, 2009ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT RILEY POWER INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: April 08, 2009DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 23259048) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL DYNAMICS CORP.
Date: January 12, 2009ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR SERVICE OF COMPLAINT TO DECEMBER 7, 2008
Date: October 02, 2008PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 23513304)
Date: January 28, 2009ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR SERVICE OF COMPLAINT TO MARCH 7, 2009
Date: January 09, 2009NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: July 07, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 67815208) FILED BY ATTORNEY JOHNSON, DEREK S. | |
July 11, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 62230916) FILED BY ATTORNEY FOLEY, STEPHEN J. | |
September 18, 2015 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 57890840): OBERG, LISA L SUBSTITUTED FOR FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN AS ATTORNEY FOR J. T. THORPE & SON, INC. | |
March 23, 2015 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 56956790): JOHNSON, DEREK S. SUBSTITUTED FOR POND, FRANK D AS ATTORNEY FOR CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION | |
August 27, 2013 | Tentative Ruling |
Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint ON ASBESTOS LAW AND MOTION CALENDAR FOR TUESDAY, AUGUST 27, 2013 IN DEPARTMENT 503 AT 9:30 A.M., LINE 1, Defendant General Dynamics Corp.?s motion to dismiss pur...
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
August 27, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT GENERAL DYNAMICS CORPORATION'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT | |
August 27, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 53927897) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL DYNAMICS CORP. | |
August 27, 2013 | Hearing |
Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
August 27, 2013 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR AUG-27-2013 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 503 | |
August 27, 2013 | Docket Event | ASBESTOS LAW AND MOTION 503, DEFENDANT GENERAL DYNAMICS CORPORATION'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT. TENTATIVE RULING ADOPTED: DEFENDANT GENERAL DYNAMICS CORPORATION'S MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 583.310 AND 583.360 IS GRANTED. NO OPPOSITION FILED. ORDER SIGNED IN OPEN COURT. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON, MATTER NOT REPORTED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.