Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Iannuzzelli, Benny, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Donadio, David R, against All Asbestos Defendants, Allis-Chalmers Corporation Product Liability Trust, Asbestos Defendants, Cbs Corporation, Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., (total of 26) See All represented by Armstrong, William Henry, Bertrand, Jean Lynne, Biderman, David T., Brainich, Marc, Fadeff, Jeffery John, (total of 14) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Harold E. Kahn presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 18, 2008 |
CategoryAsbestos |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions63 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time1164 days |
This complaint is a request for dismissal in a legal case. The case number is CGC-08-274570 and the parties involved are plaintiff Benny Nicholas Iannuzzelli and defendant Asbestos Defendants (BP). The request for dismissal is made with prejudice, me...
DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 37765806)
Date: May 24, 2011ORDER STIPULATION RE: RELEASE OF RECORDS
Date: May 16, 2008DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 23440798) AS TO DEFENDANT FMC CORP.
Date: January 23, 2009PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 24169402) FILED BY PLAINTIFF IANNUZZELLI, BENNY
Date: March 11, 2009PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 24558473) FILED BY PLAINTIFF IANNUZZELLI, BENNY
Date: April 07, 2009NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: March 18, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2011 | Hearing |
ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: HAROLD E. KAHN |
|
May 26, 2011 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAY-26-2011. DISMISSAL ON FILE. (206) | |
May 24, 2011 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 37765806) | |
April 19, 2011 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 37132438) AS TO DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION, FKA VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION | |
March 24, 2011 | Hearing |
ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: HAROLD E. KAHN |
|
March 24, 2011 | Docket Event | CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-24-2011 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAY-26-2011 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 220 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED (220) | |
January 27, 2011 | Hearing |
ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: HAROLD E. KAHN |
|
January 27, 2011 | Docket Event | CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JAN-27-2011 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-24-2011 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 220 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206) | |
November 18, 2010 | Hearing |
ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: HAROLD E. KAHN |
|
November 18, 2010 | Docket Event | CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON NOV-18-2010 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JAN-27-2011 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 220 FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.