Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by , Zide, Flint Corey, against Does 1-5, Inclusive, Wong, Kwok S, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 18, 2007 |
CategoryCommon Counts/Open Book Account/Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions392 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1352 days |
NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: December 18, 2007DEFAULT JUDGMENT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, AS TO DEFENDANT WONG, KWOK S
Date: January 13, 2009CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-18-2008 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.
Date: July 02, 2008DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1-5, INCLUSIVE
Date: January 13, 2009Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2011 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK AS TO DEFENDANT WONG, KWOK S | |
March 25, 2009 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
March 02, 2009 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CALENDAR SWEEP, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR OF MAR-25-2009, OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL OR JUDGMENT ON FILE AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS | |
February 17, 2009 | Docket Event | UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT WONG, KWOK S $2,528.49 PRINCIPAL, $1,167.95 INTEREST, $293.82 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $3,990.26, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
February 17, 2009 | Docket Event | AMENDED REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $293.82 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT WONG, KWOK S | |
January 13, 2009 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, AS TO DEFENDANT WONG, KWOK S | |
January 13, 2009 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1-5, INCLUSIVE | |
January 13, 2009 | Docket Event | DECLARATION PER 1033CCP(B) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK | |
January 13, 2009 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: INTEREST CALCULATION. | |
January 13, 2009 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF FLINT C. ZIDE RE WAIVER OF INTEREST EXCESS OF 10% AND ATTY. FEES. FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.