Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Palisades Acquisition Xvi, Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Rose, Calvin S, against Marman, John, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 10, 2007 |
CategoryComplaint Within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit By Assignee Of Record |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Cycle Time663 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2009 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT MARMAN, JOHN | |
June 20, 2008 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT MARMAN, JOHN | |
May 09, 2008 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CALENDAR SWEEP, CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR OF MAY-09-2008, OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL OR JUDGMENT ON FILE AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS | |
April 09, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PALISADES ACQUISITION XVI, LLC ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 4.0 HOURS | |
April 03, 2008 | Docket Event | UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF PALISADES ACQUISITION XVI, LLC RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT MARMAN, JOHN $1,620.40 PRINCIPAL, $238.75 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $1,859.15, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
April 03, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: INTEREST AND LACK OF ORIGINAL EXECUTED AGREEMENT. | |
April 03, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $238.75 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT MARMAN, JOHN | |
April 03, 2008 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PALISADES ACQUISITION XVI, LLC | |
April 03, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION PER 1033CCP(B) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PALISADES ACQUISITION XVI, LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.