Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CHRISTINE 'CHRISTY' BANNISTER VS. COMCAST CORPORATION et al
On August 14, 2007 a personal injury/property damage - non-vehicle related case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. Judge Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 14, 2007
Last Refreshed
August 31, 2023
Filing Location
San Francisco County, CA
Category
PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Personal Injury
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
2 years and 4 days
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a summons issued to Comcast Corporation and DOES 1 to 100 by plaintiff Christine "Christy" Bannister. The plaintiff is suing the defendant for personal injury, property damage, and wrongful death. The case number is CGC-07-46617…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED AS TO ENTIRE ACTION BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING AUG-17-2009 AT 1:30PM. THIS DISMISSAL IS PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 583.410 AND C.C.P. 583.420 (A)(1). PROCEEDINGS REPORTED BY: JOE VICKSTEIN, CSR#4780. (212) NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
August 17, 2009 | hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
August 17, 2009 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR AUG-17-2009 1:30 PM FOR DEPT 212 | |
June 15, 2009 | hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
June 10, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUN-15-2009 CONTINUED TO AUG-17-2009 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 212 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). NOTICE: IMPENDING DISCRECTIONARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 583.410 AND C.C.P. 583.420(A)(1). THE JUN-15-2009 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
April 27, 2009 | hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
April 23, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR APR-27-2009 CONTINUED TO JUN-15-2009 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 212 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE APR-27-2009 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
January 26, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JAN-26-2009 CONTINUED TO APR-27-2009 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 212 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAUL(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
January 26, 2009 | Docket Event | SANCTIONS ORDERED IN THE AMOUNT OF $350.00 AGAINST ROBERT H. GOLD, ESQ. FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON: JAN-26-2009, PAYABLE ON OR BEFORE FEB-10-2009. PROCEEDINGS REPORTED BY: SARA LERSCHEN, CSR# 6213 (212) NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
January 26, 2009 | hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
January 26, 2009 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR JAN-26-2009 1:30 PM FOR DEPT 212 | |
October 27, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR OCT-27-2008 CONTINUED TO JAN-26-2009 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 212 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
October 27, 2008 | hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
October 27, 2008 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR OCT-27-2008 1:30 PM FOR DEPT 212 | |
September 15, 2008 | hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
September 09, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR SEP-15-2008 CONTINUED TO OCT-27-2008 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 212 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE SEP-15-2008 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
July 24, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY GOLD, ROBERT HARLAN | |
June 16, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUN-16-2008 CONTINUED TO SEP-15-2008 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 212 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
June 16, 2008 | Docket Event | SANCTIONS ORDERED IN THE AMOUNT OF $350.00 AGAINST ROBERT H. GOLD, ESQ. FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON: JUN-16-2008, PAYABLE ON OR BEFORE JUL-01-2008. PROCEEDINGS REPORTED BY: TRINA AYALA, CSR#12964. (212) NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
June 16, 2008 | hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
June 16, 2008 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR JUN-16-2008 1:30 PM FOR DEPT 212 | |
March 17, 2008 | hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
March 14, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAR-17-2008 CONTINUED TO JUN-16-2008 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 212 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). MAR-17-2008 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF ROBERT H GOLD IN SUPPORT OF CONTINUING OS CONFERENCE 60 DAYS FILED BY PLAINTIFF BANNISTER, CHRISTINE 'CHRISTY' | |
January 25, 2008 | hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
January 16, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAR-17-2008 IN DEPARTMENT 212 AT 1:30 PM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE JAN-25-2008 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
December 18, 2007 | Docket Event | SANCTIONS OF $200.00 AGAINST ROBERT H. GOLD, ESQ., FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON: DEC-18-2007 PAYABLE ON OR BEFORE JAN-03-2008. PROCEEDINGS REPORTED BY: LETICIA PEREZ, CSR# 7782. (212) NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
December 18, 2007 | hearing |
PROOF OF SERVICE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
December 18, 2007 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR DEC-18-2007 9:00 AM FOR DEPT 212 | |
November 14, 2007 | Docket Event | ADDED TO PROOF OF SERVICE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR HEARING SET FOR DEC-18-2007 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 212 | |
August 14, 2007 | Docket Event | PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BANNISTER, CHRISTINE 'CHRISTY' AS TO DEFENDANT COMCAST CORPORATION DOES 1-100 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JAN-25-2008 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-15-2007 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JAN-10-2008 | |
August 14, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF |