Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Yan, Demas, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Marroquin, Caelo T., Pro Per, against Does 1-10, Inclusive, Fu, Dong Xing, Lei, Li Ming, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Peter J. Busch presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 27, 2007 |
CategoryFraud |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Cycle Time156 days |
NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: June 27, 2007CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF NOV-30-2007 IS OFF CALENDAR, REMOVED. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.
Date: November 19, 2007Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2007 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
November 30, 2007 | Hearing |
Ntc To Court & Dfs By Bankruptcy Trustee Of: A) Bankruptcy Automatic Stay Staying Proceedings
Judge: PETER J. BUSCH |
|
November 30, 2007 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR NOV-30-2007 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 301 | |
November 30, 2007 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION, 301, REAL PARTY IN INTEREST JANINA ELDER'S NOTICE TO COURT THAT JANINA ELDER (TRUSTEE) OF THE BANKRUPTCY ESTATE OF DEMAS WAI YAN HAS FILED A NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO THE US BANKRUPTCY COURT IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGE: PETER J. BUSCH, REPORTER: CAROL KAREN CSR # 8189 | |
November 19, 2007 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF NOV-30-2007 IS OFF CALENDAR, REMOVED. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
September 26, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED BY REAL PARTY IN INTEREST ELDER, JANINA M TRUSTEE OF CH. 7 BANKRUPTCY ESTATE OF DEMAS YAN | |
September 13, 2007 | Docket Event | NTC OF APPEARANCE OF TRUSTEE FILED BY REAL PARTY IN INTEREST ELDER, JANINA M TRUSTEE OF CH. 7 BANKRUPTCY ESTATE OF DEMAS YAN | |
September 12, 2007 | Docket Event | NTC TO COURT & DFS BY BANKRUPTCY TRUSTEE OF: A) BANKRUPTCY AUTOMATIC STAY STAYING PROCEEDINGS, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES SUPPORTING EXHIBIT "A", "B" FILED BY REAL PARTY IN INTEREST ELDER, JANINA M TRUSTEE OF CH. 7 BANKRUPTCY ESTATE OF DEMAS YAN HEARING SET FOR NOV-30-2007 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 | |
July 30, 2007 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: PRO PER SUBSTITUTED FOR MARROQUIN, CAELO T. AS ATTORNEY FOR YAN, DEMAS , AN INDIVIDUAL | |
July 13, 2007 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF YAN, DEMAS , AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED JUN-29-2007, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT LEI, LI MING AKA CRYSTAL LEI, AN INDIVIDUAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.