Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hollinger, David, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Hill, John Edward, against Abby Hotel, Abby Hotel, A Business Organization Form Unknown, Does 1 Through 20, Gunther Gopp, represented by Gamino, Guadalupe, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArlene T. Borick Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 21, 2007 |
CategoryWrongful Discharge |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions112 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Case Cycle Time929 days |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ABBY HOTEL
Date: January 25, 2008ORDER SHORTENING TIME
Date: October 14, 2008AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1 TO BE GUNTHER GOPP
Date: June 09, 2009NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: June 21, 2007SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR OCT-15-2008 CONTINUED TO OCT-24-2008 AT 1:30 PM IN 604.
Date: October 03, 2008NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM
Date: May 27, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2010 | Docket Event | JURY FEES OF 150.00 FOR TRANSACTION W2108A03J035 FORFEITED | |
August 14, 2009 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
August 04, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-14-2009 IS OFF CALENDAR DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
July 21, 2009 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE | |
June 23, 2009 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT; ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGMENET CONFERENCE FILED BY PLAINTIFF HOLLINGER, DAVID SERVED JUN-22-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT GUNTHER GOPP | |
June 16, 2009 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR AUG-14-2009 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212 TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S) OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) GUNTHER GOPP. THE JUN-16-2009 CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
June 09, 2009 | Docket Event | AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1 TO BE GUNTHER GOPP | |
June 09, 2009 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MICHAEL P GUTA FILED BY PLAINTIFF HOLLINGER, DAVID | |
May 07, 2009 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion To Enforce Settlement Agreement
Judge: PETER J. BUSCH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.