Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Global Reach Collection, Inc. A California Corp, S.C.Tang Investments Inc A California Corporation, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Skaggs, Jason M, Tana, Chinin, against All Persons Unknown, Claiming Any Legal Or Equita, Tang, Sung Ching, represented by Shartsis, Arthur J, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 07, 2007 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions476 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time1454 days |
This complaint is a first amended complaint to quiet title filed by S.C. Tang Investment, Inc. and Global Reach Collection, Inc. against Sung Ching Tang and all unknown defendants claiming any legal or equitable right, title, estate, lien, or interes...
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STAY THE ACTION FOR INCONVENIENT FORUM
Date: March 09, 2010DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE
Date: December 02, 2010NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: June 07, 2007ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PROOF OF SERVICE ON OCT-02-2007 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.
Date: September 24, 2007REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, AS TO DEFENDANT TANG, SUNG CHING
Date: July 11, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2011 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-10-2011 IS OFF CALENDAR DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
December 10, 2010 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
December 02, 2010 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE | |
November 29, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF DEC-10-2010 CONTINUED TO JUN-10-2011 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212, FOR STATUS OF STAY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
November 22, 2010 | Docket Event | FEE PAID FOR STIP FOR ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY PLAINTIFF S.C.TANG INVESTMENTS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION GLOBAL REACH COLLECTION, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORP | |
November 22, 2010 | Docket Event | STIPULATION CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY S.C.TANG INVESTMENTS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION GLOBAL REACH COLLECTION, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORP | |
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: SKAGGS, JASON M SUBSTITUTED FOR TANA, CHININ AS ATTORNEY FOR GLOBAL REACH COLLECTION, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORP | |
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: SKAGGS, JASON M SUBSTITUTED FOR TANA, CHININ AS ATTORNEY FOR S.C.TANG INVESTMENTS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION | |
April 09, 2010 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.