Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Patenaude, Raymond A., against Does 1 To 5, Inclusive, Thaddeus, Pace M, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 26, 2007 |
CategoryCommon Counts/Open Book Account/Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions144 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time3718 days |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Capital One Bank against Pace M Thaddeus and Does 1 to 5. The document provides instructions to the defendant, stating that they have 30 calendar days to file a written response at the court and serve a cop...
DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 5, INCLUSIVE
Date: September 17, 2007NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 17180020)
Date: June 30, 2017NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: April 26, 2007Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2017 | Docket Event | UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC. 683.110 C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT THADDEUS, PACE M $1,665.70 PRINCIPAL, $1,176.14 INTEREST, $30.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $2,871.84, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT ALL FURTHER PROCESSING TO BE DONE BY DEFAULT SECTION | |
June 30, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 17180020) | |
June 30, 2017 | Docket Event | COST BILL, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $1,176.14 INTEREST, $.00 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 17180020) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK | |
June 30, 2017 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 17180020) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK AS TO DEFENDANT THADDEUS, PACE M NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED | |
December 13, 2012 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT THADDEUS, PACE M | |
May 25, 2012 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $783.38 INTEREST, $.00 COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK | |
May 25, 2012 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT THADDEUS, PACE M | |
November 30, 2007 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
November 07, 2007 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CALENDAR SWEEP, CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR OF NOV-30-2007, OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL OR JUDGMENT ON FILE AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS | |
September 17, 2007 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 5, INCLUSIVE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.