Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Creditors Trade Association, Inc., Dba Great, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kappos, Stephen M, against Caldera, Jose A, Does 1 To 10, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 20, 2007 |
CategoryCommon Counts/Open Book Account/Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions334 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time353 days |
ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS PURSUANT TO CCP 415.50
Date: February 25, 2008DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Date: March 19, 2008NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: April 20, 2007Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2008 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CALENDAR SWEEP, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR OF APR-30-2008, OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED (SWEEP) | |
March 19, 2008 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
February 25, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS PURSUANT TO CCP 415.50 | |
February 14, 2008 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS PURSUANT TO CCP 415.50; AND DECLARATION OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CREDITORS TRADE ASSOCIATION, INC., DBA GREAT WESTERN COLLECTION BUREAU | |
February 14, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF OF GARY E. LOONEY IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF CREDITORS TRADE ASSOCIATION, INC., DBA GREAT WESTERN COLLECTION BUREAU | |
February 14, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF OF GARY E. LOONEY IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS REGARDING BUSINESS IS CLOSED FILED BY PLAINTIFF CREDITORS TRADE ASSOCIATION, INC., DBA GREAT WESTERN COLLECTION BUREAU | |
February 14, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF SYSCO FOOD SERVICE COMPANY IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF CREDITORS TRADE ASSOCIATION, INC., DBA GREAT WESTERN COLLECTION BUREAU | |
February 14, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF GARY E. LOONEY IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS REGARDING THE FACT THAT THE INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANT IS NOT A CORPROATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF CREDITORS TRADE ASSOCIATION, INC., DBA GREAT WESTERN COLLECTION BUREAU | |
February 13, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY KAPPOS, STEPHEN M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.