Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Cohn, George L, against Does 1-10, Miranda, Victor M, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 15, 2007 |
CategoryCommon Counts/Open Book Account/Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions153 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time872 days |
NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: March 15, 2007DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1-10
Date: August 15, 2007Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2009 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, PARTIALLY SATISFIED IN THE SUM OF $291.03 AS TO DEFENDANT MIRANDA, VICTOR M | |
September 25, 2008 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE INC. AS TO DEFENDANT MIRANDA, VICTOR M | |
June 02, 2008 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT MIRANDA, VICTOR M | |
June 02, 2008 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $979.32 INTEREST, $.00 COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE INC. | |
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT MIRANDA, VICTOR M | |
September 18, 2007 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT MIRANDA, VICTOR M | |
September 14, 2007 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
September 11, 2007 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE INC. | |
August 22, 2007 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CALENDAR SWEEP, CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR OF SEP-14-2007, OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL OR JUDGMENT ON FILE AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS | |
August 17, 2007 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE INC. RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT MIRANDA, VICTOR M $10,572.45 PRINCIPAL, $2,592.42 INTEREST, $375.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $13,539.87, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.