Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Naqvi, Shams, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Pro Per, against Astrophysics Incorporated, Cohen, Yochi, Does 1-50, Inclusive, Does 2-50, Inclusive, Highcom Security Incorporated, (total of 7) See All represented by Barsade, Jonathan, Russakow, Mark L, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with David Ballati presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 02, 2007 |
CategoryContract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions82 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time572 days |
MINUTES FOR JUL-11-2007 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 612
Date: July 11, 2007NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: March 02, 2007NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM
Date: April 16, 2008ORDER SHORTENING TIME RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: May 21, 2008ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SEAL A RECORD
Date: November 06, 2007ANSWER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ASTROPHYSICS INCORPORATED
Date: March 07, 2008ANSWER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT TAMURA, FEREN
Date: March 07, 2008ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS ASTROPHYSICS INC AND TAMURA'S DEMURRER
Date: November 06, 2007DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE
Date: September 09, 2008ORDER --- (DENIAL OF AN APPLICATION FOR AN) ORDER TO SEAL A RECORD(CRC 2.551)
Date: December 13, 2007Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2008 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: DAVID BALLATI |
|
September 24, 2008 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR OCT-06-2008. DISMISSAL FILE DON 9/9/08. (206) | |
September 23, 2008 | Hearing |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Judge: PETER J. BUSCH |
|
September 23, 2008 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR SEP-23-2008 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 301 | |
September 23, 2008 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION, 301, DEFENDANTS HIGHCOM SECURITY INCORPORATED, YOCHI COHEN'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS OFF CALENDAR AS DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION HAS BEEN FILED ON SEPTEMBER 9, 2008. JUDGE: PETER J. BUSCH, REPORTER: CAROL A. KAREN, CSR # 8189 (301/PJB) | |
September 18, 2008 | Hearing |
MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH |
|
September 18, 2008 | Docket Event | THERE WAS NO APPEARANCE BY EITHER SIDE FOR THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IN DEPT. 613. DISMISSAL FILED APRIL 16, 2008 THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WAS ORDERED OFF CALENDAR. JUDGE: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH, REPORTER: NOT REPORTED, CLERK: DAVID V. SWANSON, DEPT. 613 | |
September 09, 2008 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE | |
September 09, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF NAQVI, SHAMS | |
September 04, 2008 | Hearing |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Judge: PETER J. BUSCH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.