Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Asset Acceptance Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by , Genchel, Robin, against Does 1-30, Inclusive, Soi, Andy, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArlene T. Borick Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 26, 2007 |
CategoryCommon Counts/Open Book Account/Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions252 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time805 days |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SOI, ANDY
Date: April 02, 2007ORDER TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO EX PARTE APPLICATION DISMISSAL OF NOV-05-2007 SET ASIDE
Date: December 01, 2008ORDER ON DECLARATION RE: DEFAULT IN PAYMENTS
Date: December 01, 2008NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: February 26, 2007Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 11, 2009 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC | |
December 01, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO EX PARTE APPLICATION DISMISSAL OF NOV-05-2007 SET ASIDE | |
December 01, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER ON DECLARATION RE: DEFAULT IN PAYMENTS | |
December 01, 2008 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT SOI, ANDY $11,658.84 PRINCIPAL, TOTAL JUDGMENT $11,658.84, SEE SCANNED DOC | |
September 10, 2008 | Docket Event | FILING FEE FOR EX PARTE APPLICATION TO VACATE REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC | |
September 10, 2008 | Docket Event | FIRST APPEARANCE FILING FEE OF DEFT. FILED BY DEFENDANT SOI, ANDY | |
September 10, 2008 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC ALSO FILED BY DEFENDANT SOI, ANDY | |
December 04, 2007 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
November 09, 2007 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF DEC-04-2007 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL FILED. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
November 05, 2007 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSIANT TO CCP 664.6 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.