Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Unifund Ccr Partners, A Partnership Doing Business, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Quall, Matthew W., against Does 1-100, Inclusive, Schick, John D, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArlene T. Borick Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryCommon Counts/Open Book Account/Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions167 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time168 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2007 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
June 15, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUN-20-2007 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
June 14, 2007 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
May 04, 2007 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
April 18, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUN-20-2007 IN DEPARTMENT 212 AT 1:30 PM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE MAY-04-2007 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
April 09, 2007 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS, A PARTNERSHIP DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 2.0 HOURS | |
February 07, 2007 | Docket Event | NON SERVICE REPORT FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS, A PARTNERSHIP DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA AS TO DEFENDANT SCHICK, JOHN D AN INDIVIDUAL | |
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF | |
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event | COMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS, A PARTNERSHIP DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA AS TO DEFENDANT SCHICK, JOHN D AN INDIVIDUAL DOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAY-04-2007 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON FEB-27-2007 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-19-2007 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.