Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Target National Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Patenaude, Raymond A., against Does 1-5, Inclusive, Jones, Vernita, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 18, 2006 |
CategoryCommon Counts/Open Book Account/Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions72 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2019 days |
DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1-5, INCLUSIVE
Date: February 28, 2007NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: December 18, 2006Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2012 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, FILED BY PLAINTIFF TARGET NATIONAL BANK AS TO DEFENDANT JONES, VERNITA | |
February 20, 2009 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT JONES, VERNITA | |
February 20, 2009 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $842.52 INTEREST, $.00 COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF TARGET NATIONAL BANK | |
January 13, 2009 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT JONES, VERNITA | |
July 19, 2007 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $148.29 INTEREST, $.00 COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF TARGET NATIONAL BANK | |
July 19, 2007 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT JONES, VERNITA | |
April 20, 2007 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
March 28, 2007 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CALENDAR SWEEP, CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR OF APR-20-2007, OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL OR JUDGMENT ON FILE AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS | |
February 28, 2007 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1-5, INCLUSIVE | |
February 28, 2007 | Docket Event | UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF TARGET NATIONAL BANK RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT JONES, VERNITA $4,069.64 PRINCIPAL, $227.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $4,296.64, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.