Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Persolve Llc A Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Cox, Pamela L., Raichelson, Michael H., Pro Per, against Does 1-100 Inclusive, Wong, Frankie, Persolve Llc A Limited Liability Company, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Garrett L. Wong presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 30, 2006 |
CategoryCommon Counts/Open Book Account/Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions71 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
This complaint is a document related to a legal case. It appears to be a request for dismissal without prejudice of a complaint filed by Persolve LLC, a limited liability company, against Frankie Wong and others. The case number is CGC-06-458306 and ...
DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1-100 INCLUSIVE
Date: February 09, 2007REMITTITUR FILED
Date: May 24, 2021NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL SENT TO APPELLANT WONG, FRANKIE AN INDIVIDUAL
Date: June 30, 2020ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR REHEARING
Date: April 20, 2021CLERK'S ESTIMATE OF COST OF APPEAL RECORD SENT TO RESPONDENT, ESTIMATED COST $69.00
Date: September 10, 2020NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL SENT TO APPELLANT WONG, FRANKIE AN INDIVIDUAL
Date: February 27, 2020APPELLATE DIVISION JUDGMENT
Date: March 22, 2021NOTICE TO APPELLATE DEPARTMENT OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL
Date: November 27, 2019CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: November 01, 2019DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY PLAINTIFF PERSOLVE LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
Date: October 11, 2012NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: November 30, 2006REPONSE TO COURTS ORDER FILED BY APPELLANT WONG, FRANKIE AN INDIVIDUAL
Date: February 20, 2020NOTICE OF APPEAL [NO IFP] FILED BY APPELLANT WONG, FRANKIE AN INDIVIDUAL
Date: November 01, 2019NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 60187499)
Date: February 08, 2017RECORD ON APPEAL TRANSMITTED TO APPELLATE DEPT
Date: September 10, 2020NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED (APPELLANT'S BRIEF IS DUE BY OCT-13-2020)
Date: September 11, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR FILED | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR ISSUED | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR REHEARING | |
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | RECONSIDERATION ON APPEAL FILED BY APPELLANT WONG, FRANKIE AN INDIVIDUAL | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | APPELLATE DIVISION JUDGMENT | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | APPELLATE COURT CALENDAR OF MAR-12-2021 - APPEAL OF CIVIL JUDGMENT DISMISSED. | |
March 12, 2021 | Hearing | APPEAL OF CIVIL JUDGMENT | |
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR MAR-12-2021 02:00 PM FOR DEPT 622 | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF ORAL ARGUMENT FILED BY APPELLANT WONG, FRANKIE AN INDIVIDUAL | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | WRITTEN ORAL ARGUMENT FILED BY APPELLANT WONG, FRANKIE AN INDIVIDUAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.