Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Advance Magazine Group Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Goldman, Martin F., against Blue Marlin Corporation A Corporation, Does 1 Through 20 Inclusive, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 02, 2006 |
CategoryCommon Counts/Open Book Account/Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions126 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time393 days |
DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 THROUGH 20 INCLUSIVE
Date: March 08, 2007NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: November 02, 2006Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2007 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT BLUE MARLIN CORPORATION A CORPORATION | |
November 26, 2007 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED UNSERVED AS TO DEFENDANT BLUE MARLIN CORPORATION A CORPORATION | |
May 25, 2007 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
May 16, 2007 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAY-25-2007 IS OFF CALENDAR, JUDGMENT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
April 30, 2007 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT BLUE MARLIN CORPORATION A CORPORATION | |
April 26, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
April 10, 2007 | Docket Event | UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF ADVANCE MAGAZINE GROUP INC RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT BLUE MARLIN CORPORATION A CORPORATION $38,230.00 PRINCIPAL, $5,006.55 INTEREST, $415.39 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $43,651.94, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
April 10, 2007 | Docket Event | DECLARATION MARTIN F. GOLDMAN FILED RE: WAIVER OF STATUTORY ATTORNEY'S FEES FILED BY PLAINTIFF ADVANCE MAGAZINE GROUP INC | |
April 10, 2007 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $415.39 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT BLUE MARLIN CORPORATION A CORPORATION | |
April 06, 2007 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.