Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Fazio, Peter, Money Link, Inc., Swipe Usa Llc, Swipe Usa, Llc, A California Limited Liability, Hum, Gary S., (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Harris, Mark H, Mcginity, Brian, Tenconi, Donald Dennis, Walsh, James Richard, against Covucci, Francesco, Does 1-10, Inclusive, Does 1 To 100, Swipe Usa Llc, represented by Harris, Mark H, Mcginity, Brian, Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Gail Dekreon presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 30, 2006 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1446 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time2136 days |
This complaint is a second amended complaint filed by Peter Fazio against Swipe USA LLC et al. The complaint alleges breach of contract, conversion, tortious interference with business relations, intentional interference with prospective economic adv...
ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL PURSUANT TO STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: August 01, 2008ORDER DENYING COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD
Date: September 27, 2010RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONS TO CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT
Date: January 09, 2012MINUTES FOR NOV-17-2010 8:30 AM FOR DEPT 306
Date: November 17, 2010MINUTES FOR NOV-01-2010 8:30 AM FOR DEPT 306
Date: November 01, 2010MINUTES FOR OCT-25-2010 8:30 AM FOR DEPT 306
Date: October 25, 2010MINUTES FOR OCT-28-2010 8:30 AM FOR DEPT 306
Date: October 28, 2010MINUTES FOR OCT-29-2010 8:30 AM FOR DEPT 306
Date: October 29, 2010MINUTES FOR OCT-26-2010 8:30 AM FOR DEPT 306
Date: October 26, 2010MINUTES FOR NOV-02-2010 8:30 AM FOR DEPT 306
Date: November 02, 2010MINUTES FOR OCT-20-2010 8:30 AM FOR DEPT 306
Date: October 20, 2010MINUTES FOR OCT-27-2010 8:30 AM FOR DEPT 306
Date: October 27, 2010NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL SENT TO APPELLANT
Date: February 23, 2012NOTICE OF APPEAL/REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT (NOTICE OF APPEAL ONLY) FILED BY DEFENDANT SWIPE USA LLC
Date: November 16, 2011CLERK'S ESTIMATE OF COST OF APPEAL RECORD - RESPONDENT
Date: February 09, 2012NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL SENT TO APPELLANT
Date: December 09, 2011CLERK'S CERTIFICATE RE DISMISSAL OF APPEAL
Date: March 13, 2012ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S FEES & COSTS.
Date: December 05, 2011DECLARATION OF (SUPPLEMENTAL) JAMES R WALSH FILED BY PLAINTIFF FAZIO, PETER MONEY LINK, INC.
Date: November 10, 2011ORDER DENYING MOTION AND/OR APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY STAY ON ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT
Date: August 22, 2011MINUTES FOR AUG-19-2011 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 306
Date: August 19, 2011MINUTES FOR NOV-12-2010 8:30 AM FOR DEPT 306
Date: November 12, 2010MINUTES FOR NOV-16-2010 8:30 AM FOR DEPT 306
Date: November 16, 2010MINUTES FOR NOV-15-2010 8:30 AM FOR DEPT 306
Date: November 15, 2010MINUTES FOR NOV-03-2010 8:30 AM FOR DEPT 306
Date: November 03, 2010MINUTES FOR NOV-04-2010 8:30 AM FOR DEPT 306
Date: November 04, 2010MINUTES FOR NOV-05-2010 8:30 AM FOR DEPT 306
Date: November 05, 2010SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT SWIPE USA LLC
Date: January 12, 2007NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: October 30, 2006MINUTES FOR OCT-17-2011 9:00 AM FOR DEPT 212
Date: October 17, 2011SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR MAR-05-2008 CONTINUED TO MAR-20-2008 AT 3:00 PM IN 501
Date: March 04, 2008MINUTES FOR NOV-08-2010 10:03 AM FOR DEPT 306
Date: November 08, 2010SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR OCT-31-2007 CONTINUED TO MAR-05-2008 AT 1:30 PM IN 501
Date: October 25, 2007NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM
Date: June 19, 2007NOTICE OF NON-PAYMENT OF JURY FEES
Date: March 05, 2008NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM
Date: August 06, 2007MINUTES FOR OCT-19-2010 9:00 AM FOR DEPT 306
Date: October 19, 2010MINUTES FOR SEP-27-2010 10:00 AM FOR DEPT 306
Date: September 27, 2010ORDER CHANGING HEARING DATE
Date: September 09, 2010MINUTES FOR FEB-24-2009 3:30 PM FOR DEPT 501
Date: February 26, 2009MINUTES FOR FEB-23-2009 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 501
Date: February 23, 2009MINUTES FOR JUL-24-2008 3:30 PM FOR DEPT 613
Date: July 24, 2008ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE PURSUANT TO STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: November 07, 2008ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT COVUCCI'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AFTER COURT TRIAL (C.C.P. SECTION 631.18)
Date: December 09, 2010ORDER - STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING THE TRIAL DATE
Date: September 29, 2009ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SWIPE USA LLC
Date: January 12, 2007CLOSING BRIEF OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT SWIPE USA, LLC FILED BY DEFENDANT SWIPE USA LLC
Date: December 21, 2010ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL PURSUANT TO STIPULATION
Date: March 18, 2010ORDER SHORTENING TIME RE: MOTION FOR A CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL
Date: September 01, 2010ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR FILING JUDGMENT ( CRC RULE 3.1590(M) )
Date: June 03, 2011STATEMENT OF DECISION AND ORDER FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ( CRC RULE 3.1590(1) )
Date: June 03, 2011ORDER ALLOWING THE FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: October 25, 2007ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL PURSUANT TO STIPULATION
Date: October 25, 2007ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS TO BE HEARD (TO BE SET FOR 12/14/07)
Date: December 06, 2007ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS OF CASE(S) CGC-07-460154 WITH CASE CGC-06-457420 FOR ALL PURPOSES
Date: December 27, 2007ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SWIPE USA LLC
Date: January 14, 2008NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (PROCEED WITHOUT RT)
Date: December 27, 2011NOTIFY APPELLANT OF COSTS OF RECORD ON APPEAL
Date: February 09, 2012ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL
Date: March 19, 2008ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FILED 11/16/11 (A133982 DIV 2)
Date: March 21, 2012REMITTITUR DISMISSED (A133982 DIV 2)
Date: May 22, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 04, 2012 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, FILED BY DEFENDANT SWIPE USA LLC AS TO PLAINTIFF FAZIO, PETER | |
September 04, 2012 | Docket Event | COPYING FEES (2 PAGE, 1 CERTIFIED COPY) PAID BY DEFENDANT SWIPE USA LLC | |
June 06, 2012 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO ALAMEDA COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT SWIPE USA LLC | |
May 22, 2012 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR DISMISSED (A133982 DIV 2) | |
April 16, 2012 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO DEFENDANT SWIPE USA LLC | |
March 21, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FILED 11/16/11 (A133982 DIV 2) | |
March 13, 2012 | Docket Event | CLERK'S CERTIFICATE RE DISMISSAL OF APPEAL | |
February 23, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL SENT TO APPELLANT | |
February 09, 2012 | Docket Event | CLERK'S ESTIMATE OF COST OF APPEAL RECORD - RESPONDENT | |
February 09, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTIFY APPELLANT OF COSTS OF RECORD ON APPEAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.