Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Cavalry Portfolio Services, Llc, As Assignee, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Winn, Brian N, against Does - 10, Inclusive, Tandjung, Suwandi, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 03, 2006 |
CategoryCommon Counts/Open Book Account/Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions64 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time606 days |
DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES - 10, INCLUSIVE
Date: June 06, 2006NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: April 03, 2006Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2007 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, PARTIALLY SATISFIED IN THE SUM OF $5,363.25 AS TO DEFENDANT TANDJUNG, SUWANDI | |
January 03, 2007 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A. AS TO DEFENDANT TANDJUNG, SUWANDI | |
October 02, 2006 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $153.70 INTEREST, $34.00 COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A. | |
October 02, 2006 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT TANDJUNG, SUWANDI | |
August 04, 2006 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
July 10, 2006 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CALENDAR SWEEP, CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR OF AUG-04-2006, OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL OR JUDGMENT ON FILE AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS | |
July 07, 2006 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A. | |
June 06, 2006 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES - 10, INCLUSIVE | |
June 06, 2006 | Docket Event | UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A. RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT TANDJUNG, SUWANDI $3,941.70 PRINCIPAL, $1,110.24 INTEREST, $230.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $5,281.94, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT ( MAILED) | |
June 06, 2006 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $230.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT TANDJUNG, SUWANDI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.