Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Batts Jr, Jim, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Donadio, David R, against Allis-Chalmers Corporation Product Liability Trust, Asbestos Defendants B P As Reflected On Exhibits, A.W. Chesterton Company, Buffalo Pumps, Inc., Cbs Corporation, A Delaware Corporation, (total of 40) See All represented by Bassi, Marte J, Crosby, Thomas Carlisle, Cunningham, James Patrick, Fadeff, Jeffery John, Gamba, Paul Joseph, (total of 22) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Ronald Evans Quidachay presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 21, 2006 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions98 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time1724 days |
This complaint is an amendment to a legal case in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The plaintiffs, Jim Batts, Jr. and Shirley Batts, are filing a complaint against several asbestos defendants. The plaintiffs have learned the...
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 22750435) FILED BY ATTORNEY GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE
Date: December 04, 2008ORDER GRANTING LESLIE CONTROLS, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: September 06, 2007SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS (TRANSACTION ID # 15974345) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BATTS JR, JIM
Date: August 16, 2007PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 15974345) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BATTS JR, JIM
Date: August 16, 2007PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 15718239) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BATTS JR, JIM
Date: July 26, 2007ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT THORPE INSULATION COMPANY
Date: May 01, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS METAL GASKET CO.
Date: April 24, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, INC.
Date: April 26, 2006INDEX TO MOTIONS IN LIMINE (TRANSACTION ID # 16160174) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.
Date: August 31, 2007ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.
Date: April 21, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT GOULDS PUMPS, INC.
Date: May 02, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SULZER PUMPS (US) INC.
Date: April 28, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT LESLIE CONTROLS,INC.
Date: April 19, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL ELCTRIC COMPANY
Date: April 18, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY
Date: April 20, 2006DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 13098773) FILED BY DEFENDANT DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION
Date: December 05, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 13098773) FILED BY DEFENDANT DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION
Date: December 05, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 12957297) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY
Date: November 17, 2006DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 13170952) FILED BY DEFENDANT A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY
Date: December 12, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ITT INDUSTRIES, INC.
Date: May 03, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE & SON, INC.
Date: May 03, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT GORMAN-RUPP COMPANY
Date: May 22, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION ("PARKER")_
Date: April 27, 2006ORDER : STIPULATION RE: RELEASE OF RECORDS, AND ORDER
Date: May 05, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER, LLC
Date: June 27, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT IMO INDUSTRIES INC.
Date: April 27, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 13170952) FILED BY DEFENDANT A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY
Date: December 12, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.
Date: April 11, 2006NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: March 21, 2006DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT CRANE CO.
Date: November 09, 2009Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2010 | Docket Event | REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $150.00 RE 18871 FOR TRANSACTION W1707809J001 (JURY FEES), PAYABLE TO BRAYTON, DOC #1903324429, WARRANT #38200355, DATED DEC-09-2010 | |
July 23, 2010 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32300668) AS TO DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE & SON, INC. | |
January 27, 2010 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT TRANSACTION ID: 29233919 AS TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER, LLC | |
January 25, 2010 | Hearing |
ASBESTOS JURY TRIAL
Judge: RONALD E. QUIDACHAY |
|
January 15, 2010 | Hearing |
ASBESTOS SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: A. JAMES ROBERTSON II |
|
January 15, 2010 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR JAN-15-2010 - BR411 SUBGROUPS A & B (IN TRIAL WITH JUDGE QUIDACHAY) IS TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. SETTLED PER COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF. (LAF 502) | |
January 14, 2010 | Hearing |
ASBESTOS SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: A. JAMES ROBERTSON II |
|
January 14, 2010 | Docket Event | ASBESTOS SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR JAN-14-2010 CONTINUED TO JAN-15-2010 AT 10:30 AM IN 502. BR411 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD [SUBGROUPS A & B IN TRIAL WITH JUDGE QUIDACHAY; SUBGROUP D IN TRIAL WITH JUDGE MASON] MATTER CONTINUED FOR FURTHER SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS. JUDGE ROBERTSON; CLERK: L. FISCELLA; NOT REPORTED (502) | |
January 13, 2010 | Hearing |
ASBESTOS SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: A. JAMES ROBERTSON II |
|
January 13, 2010 | Docket Event | ASBESTOS JURY TRIAL SET FOR JAN-25-2010 VACATED. CASE SETTLED PER PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL ON 1/13/10. JUDGE R. QUIDACHAY, CLERK R. PASCUAL. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.