Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Worldwide Asset Purchasing, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Clark, Rory W, against Beltran, Angelita M, Does 1 Through X, Inclusive, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArlene T. Borick Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2006 |
CategoryCommon Counts/Open Book Account/Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions107 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1779 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY CLARK, RORY W | |
July 26, 2006 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
July 18, 2006 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING, LLC | |
July 03, 2006 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CALENDAR SWEEP, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR OF JUL-26-2006, OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL OR JUDGMENT ON FILE AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS | |
June 16, 2006 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
June 07, 2006 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING, LLC RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT BELTRAN, ANGELITA M AKA ANGELITA BELTRAN AKA ANGELITA RAYOS AKA ANGELITA M. RAYOS $2,425.75 PRINCIPAL, $240.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $2,665.75, SEE SCANNED DOC (MAILED) | |
June 02, 2006 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $240.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT BELTRAN, ANGELITA M AKA ANGELITA BELTRAN AKA ANGELITA RAYOS AKA ANGELITA M. RAYOS | |
June 02, 2006 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF ACCOUNT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING, LLC | |
June 02, 2006 | Docket Event | DECLARATION AS TO MONIES OWING PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 585 IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY; UNAVAILABILITY OF ORIGINAL WRITTEN OBLIGATION EXECUTED BY DEFENDANT; DECLARATION RE: LOST OR STOLEN CREDIT CARD. FILED BY PLAINTIFF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING, LLC | |
June 02, 2006 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF RORY W. CLARK PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 1033 FILED BY PLAINTIFF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING, LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.