Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Brusseau, Phillip J, against Dawson, Michael S, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 21, 2005 |
CategoryCommon Counts/Open Book Account/Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions110 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time231 days |
DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Date: April 10, 2006NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: December 21, 2005Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND POS FILED BY PLTF | |
June 07, 2006 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
May 24, 2006 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
May 15, 2006 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CALENDAR SWEEP, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR OF JUN-07-2006, OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED (SWEEP) | |
April 21, 2006 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
April 10, 2006 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
April 06, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUN-07-2006 IN DEPARTMENT 212 AT 1:30 PM FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). THE APR-21-2006 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
January 31, 2006 | Docket Event | DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CCP 395(B); VENUE FOR PERSONAL, FAMILY OR HOUSEHOLD OBLIGATIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK | |
January 17, 2006 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK SERVED JAN-05-2006, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT DAWSON, MICHAEL S | |
December 21, 2005 | Docket Event | COMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK AS TO DEFENDANT DAWSON, MICHAEL S SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-21-2006 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON FEB-21-2006 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-06-2006 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.