Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
American Express Centurion Bank, A Utah Banking In, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Bleier, Elizabeth A, against Does 1-5, Inclusive, Miller, Ruth, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 16, 2005 |
CategoryCommon Counts/Open Book Account/Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions90 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1370 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2009 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK, A UTAH BANKING IN STITUTION AS TO DEFENDANT MILLER, RUTH | |
July 30, 2009 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK, A UTAH BANKING IN STITUTION AS TO DEFENDANT MILLER, RUTH | |
May 12, 2009 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, FULLY SATISFIED IN THE SUM OF $12,118.72 SUPPLEMENTAL WRIT RETURN AS TO DEFENDANT MILLER, RUTH | |
December 21, 2006 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, PARTIALLY SATISFIED IN THE SUM OF $2,589.66 AS TO DEFENDANT MILLER, RUTH | |
March 21, 2006 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK, A UTAH BANKING IN STITUTION | |
March 17, 2006 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
March 15, 2006 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT MILLER, RUTH | |
March 13, 2006 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $24.71 INTEREST, $.00 COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK, A UTAH BANKING IN STITUTION | |
March 06, 2006 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAR-17-2006 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ENTERED. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
February 27, 2006 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK, A UTAH BANKING IN STITUTION RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT MILLER, RUTH $9,993.17 PRINCIPAL, $1,075.96 INTEREST, $206.30 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $11,275.43, SEE SCANNED DOC ( MAILED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.