Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
French, Karl, Hayhurst, Vince 'Casey', filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Cohelan, Timothy D, against Barclay Global Investors Usa Inc., A California Co, Barclays Global Investors Usa Inc., Does 1-100, Inclusive, represented by Wilcox, Maurice Kirby, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Mary E. Wiss presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary E. Wiss Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management117 days |
Filing DateJuly 27, 2005 |
CategoryOther Non Exempt Complaints (Damages , Injunctive Relief And Restitution) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions603 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time1225 days |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BARCLAYS GLOBAL INVESTORS USA INC.
Date: September 14, 2005ORDER AND STIPULATION TO AMEND CLASS LIST
Date: August 20, 2007ORDER RE: COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION - DENIED
Date: October 27, 2005ORDER GRANTING AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES, COSTS, AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVE ENHANCEMENT
Date: April 23, 2007MINUTES FOR MAR-21-2007 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 504
Date: March 21, 2007MINUTES FOR NOV-29-2006 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 504
Date: November 29, 2006MINUTES FOR NOV-20-2006 2:00 PM FOR DEPT 504
Date: November 20, 2006MINUTES FOR JAN-25-2006 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 504
Date: January 25, 2006STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CONFIDENTIALITY. SEE SCANNED CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION AND ORDER.
Date: December 16, 2005MINUTES FOR NOV-21-2005 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 504
Date: November 23, 2005NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: July 27, 2005MINUTES FOR APR-11-2007 11:00 AM FOR DEPT 504
Date: April 11, 2007DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE
Date: October 10, 2007JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT
Date: March 22, 2007Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2008 | Docket Event | SINGLE ASSIGNMENT TERMINATED | |
December 13, 2007 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF CARYN DONLY REGARDING PRINTING AND MAILING OF CLAIMANT SETTLEMENT AWARD PAYMENTS FILED BY DEFENDANT BARCLAYS GLOBAL INVESTORS USA INC. | |
December 05, 2007 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 OSC - TRIAL DEPARTMENT
Judge: MARY E. WISS |
|
October 19, 2007 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF DEC-05-2007 IN DEPT. 504 IS OFF CALENDAR - DISMISSAL FILED (504) | |
October 10, 2007 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE | |
October 02, 2007 | Docket Event | CRC 255 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF DEC-05-2007 CONTINUED TO DEC-05-2007 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 504. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
October 02, 2007 | Docket Event | ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR OSC RE DISMISSAL HEARING SET FOR DEC-05-2007 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 504 | |
August 20, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER AND STIPULATION TO AMEND CLASS LIST | |
August 16, 2007 | Docket Event | FEE PAID: STIP TO AMEND CLASS LIST AND ORDER FILED BY PLAINTIFF HAYHURST, VINCE 'CASEY' ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED FRENCH, KARL ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED | |
July 16, 2007 | Docket Event | FEE FOR STIPULATION PAID TO AMENDED CLASS LIST AND ORDER FILED BY DEFENDANT BARCLAYS GLOBAL INVESTORS USA INC. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.