Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Asset Acceptance, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Ray, Thomas Morgan, against Does 1-10, Inclusive, Rodriguez, Jorge, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 15, 2005 |
CategoryCommon Counts/Open Book Account/Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions74 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time319 days |
This document appears to be a dismissal request in a legal case. The case number is CGC-05-440480 and the filing date is July 7, 2005. The parties involved are Asset Acceptance, LLC as the plaintiff/petitioner and Jorge Rodriguez as the defendant/res...
DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1-10, INCLUSIVE
Date: June 28, 2005NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: April 15, 2005DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT
Date: July 07, 2005Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER COMPELLING DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES AND MANDATING PAYMENT OF CERTAIN FEES BY DEFENDANT | |
August 19, 2005 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
July 25, 2005 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CALENDAR SWEEP, CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR OF AUG-19-2005, OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL OR JUDGMENT ON FILE AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS | |
July 07, 2005 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT | |
July 06, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS REGARDING BANKRUPTCY | |
June 28, 2005 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1-10, INCLUSIVE | |
June 28, 2005 | Docket Event | UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT RODRIGUEZ, JORGE $8,312.27 PRINCIPAL, $1,729.74 INTEREST, $223.80 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $10,265.81, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
June 28, 2005 | Docket Event | RE INTEREST CALCULATION ; ATTY. FEE CALCULATION; AND WAIVER OF EXCESS PRINCIPAL . FILED BY PLAINTIFF ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC | |
June 28, 2005 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $223.80 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT RODRIGUEZ, JORGE | |
June 02, 2005 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED FILED BY PLAINTIFF ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.