Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Stebbins, Donald Rogers, against Does 1 To 10, Guevara, Carmelita, Guevara, Eduardo H., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 16, 2005 |
CategoryCommon Counts/Open Book Account/Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions82 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1017 days |
DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10
Date: May 09, 2005NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: February 16, 2005Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2007 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, FULLY SATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT GUEVARA, EDUARDO H. GUEVARA, CARMELITA | |
March 19, 2007 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC AS TO DEFENDANT GUEVARA, EDUARDO H. GUEVARA, CARMELITA | |
October 12, 2006 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT GUEVARA, EDUARDO H. GUEVARA, CARMELITA | |
October 12, 2006 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $1,470.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $249.94 INTEREST, $65.00 COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC | |
September 21, 2005 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT GUEVARA, EDUARDO H. GUEVARA, CARMELITA | |
June 22, 2005 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT GUEVARA, EDUARDO H. GUEVARA, CARMELITA | |
June 17, 2005 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
June 14, 2005 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC | |
June 14, 2005 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $19.57 INTEREST, $.00 COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC | |
May 23, 2005 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CALENDAR SWEEP, CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR OF JUN-17-2005, OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL OR JUDGMENT ON FILE AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.