Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Deasis, Alicia, Deasis, Mathew Melandres, Speck Cab Company Dba Veterans Cab Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Sheray, Sidney R., against Deasis, Alicia, Deasis, Mathew Melandres, Does 1-20, represented by Crowell, Thomas M., Windsor, Jeffrey R., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArlene T. Borick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 05, 2004 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is a cross-complaint filed by defendants Mathew Melendres Deasis and Alicia Deasis against cross-defendants Speck Cab Company dba Veterans Cab Company and ROES 1-10. The cross-complainants allege that if they are held liable for any da...
NOTICE OF NON-PAYMENT OF JURY FEES
Date: May 24, 2006DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE
Date: September 25, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT DEASIS, MATHEW MELANDRES
Date: December 30, 2004Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2007 | Docket Event | JURY FEES OF 150.00 FOR TRANSACTION W1706526J014 FORFEITED | |
October 11, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT DEASIS, MATHEW MELANDRES DEASIS, ALICIA | |
October 10, 2006 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
October 04, 2006 | Docket Event | CRC 225 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF OCT-10-2006 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL FILED. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
September 25, 2006 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE | |
August 01, 2006 | Docket Event | CRC 225 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF AUG-01-2006 CONTINUED TO OCT-10-2006 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
August 01, 2006 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
August 01, 2006 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR AUG-01-2006 10:00 AM FOR DEPT 212 | |
June 12, 2006 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR JUN-12-2006 - CASE SETTLED AFTER BEING SENT TO JUDGE PRO TEM. TERMS OF THE SETTLEMENT WERE NOT PUT ON THE RECORD. ASSIGNED TO PRETRIAL DEPT. 212 ON AUG-01-2006 AT 10:00 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 225. (206) | |
June 12, 2006 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: ROBERT L. DONDERO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.