Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Au, Kwok Kai, Chan, Yim Yung, Yuen, Sou King, Claussen, Maureen, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lee, Wing Cheong, against Claussen, Maureen, Does 1 To 25, represented by Townsend, Victoria E., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2002 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage - Vehicle Related |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
PANEL OF ARBITRATORS ASSIGNED. REJECTION DATE AUG-14-2003.
Date: August 04, 2003ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CLAUSSEN, MAUREEN
Date: February 26, 2003DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CLAUSSEN, MAUREEN
Date: March 19, 2004DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE
Date: December 30, 2003Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2004 | Hearing | MASTER CALENDAR JURY | |
March 19, 2004 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CLAUSSEN, MAUREEN | |
March 18, 2004 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM MASTER COURT CALENDAR SET FOR MAR-22-2004 - ENTIRE CASE DISMISSED 12/30/03. | |
March 16, 2004 | Docket Event | OFF JURY CALENDAR A/C FAILURE TO DEPOSIT JURY FEES WITHIN PRESCRIBED TIME AS SET FORTH IN SEC. 631 CCP RESET FOR COURT TRIAL ON MAR-22-2004 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 206 | |
February 27, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NON-PAYMENT OF JURY FEES | |
December 30, 2003 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE | |
December 15, 2003 | Hearing |
ARBITRATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
December 12, 2003 | Hearing |
OBJECTION HEARING CALENDAR
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
December 11, 2003 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY DEFT. | |
November 20, 2003 | Docket Event | CASE REMOVED FROM PENDING TRIAL DE NOVO CALENDAR IF OBJECTION: HEARING SET FOR DEC-12-2003 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 212 SET FOR JURY TRIAL ON MAR-22-2004 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 206 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.