Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Dipirro, Michael, filed a(n) Injunctive Relief case represented by Sheffer, Gregory M, against Coldwater Creek, Does 1 To 150, represented by Kirwin, Betty-Jane, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArlene T. Borick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 02, 2002 |
CategoryInjunctive Relief |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT COLDWATER CREEK
Date: May 09, 2002ORDER APPROVING PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT
Date: February 27, 2003Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2003 | Docket Event | OBJECTION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AND REQUEST TO VACATE HEARING FILED BY PLAINTIFF DIPIRRO, MICHAEL | |
April 15, 2003 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
April 10, 2003 | Docket Event | CRC 225 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF APR-15-2003 IS OFF CALENDAR JUDGMENT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
April 08, 2003 | Docket Event | OBJECTION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL & REQUEST TO VACATE HEARING, POS FILED BY PLAINTIFF DIPIRRO, MICHAEL | |
April 07, 2003 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: DONNA J. HITCHENS |
|
March 18, 2003 | Hearing |
MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: DAVID BALLATI |
|
March 18, 2003 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON MAR-18-2003 IN DEPT. 604 -NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED NOVEMBER 7, 2002. | |
March 04, 2003 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
February 28, 2003 | Docket Event | CRC 225 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAR-04-2003 CONTINUED TO APR-15-2003 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
February 27, 2003 | Hearing |
Ntc Of Joint Mtn & Mtn To Approve Consent Judgment
Judge: DAVID A. GARCIA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.