Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 27, 2001 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2003 | Tentative Ruling |
For Hearing On Good Faith Settlment DEFENDANT JON V WITTEMYER, Hearing On Good Faith Settlment GRANT.NO OPPOSITION FILED.(302/REQ/JU)
Judge: RONALD E. QUIDACHAY |
|
September 19, 2002 | Tentative Ruling |
Joinder In Defts Berkowitz & Grant Building Co Llc'S Demurrer DEMURRER OVERRULED AS TO THE 1ST CAUSE OF ACTION FOR BREACH OF WRITTEN AND ORAL AGREEMENTS, THE 5TH CAUSE OF ACTION FOR NEGLIGENCE, AND TH...
Judge: A. JAMES ROBERTSON II |
|
August 07, 2002 | Tentative Ruling |
DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT CONTINUED TO 9-19 PER AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES.
Judge: A. JAMES ROBERTSON II |
|
December 20, 2001 | Tentative Ruling |
MOTION (Demurrer To) To Strike First Amended Complaint For Actual And Punitive Damages; Deft'S Berkowitz And Grant Bldg. Co., Llc.'S Demurrer To And Motion To Strike Plntf'S First Amended Complaint Fo...
Judge: A. JAMES ROBERTSON II |
|
December 06, 2001 | Tentative Ruling |
Re-Notice Of Mtn For Order Consolidating Actions Motion to Consolidate: DENY. (CW)
Judge: A. JAMES ROBERTSON II |
|
December 05, 2001 | Tentative Ruling |
MOTION (Demurrer To) To Strike First Amended Complaint For Actual And Punitive Damages; Deft'S Berkowitz And Grant Bldg. Co., Llc.'S Demurrer To And Motion To Strike Plntf'S First Amended Complaint Fo...
Judge: A. JAMES ROBERTSON II |
|
November 27, 2001 | Tentative Ruling |
MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS RENOTICED TO 12-6.
Judge: A. JAMES ROBERTSON II |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.