Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nunes, Carlos, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Der Manuelian, Christopher, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Calaveras County. This case was filed in Calaveras County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management117 days |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2003 |
Category(23) Limited Other Pi/Pd/Wd - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCalaveras County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Cycle Time2353 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Tickler | |
January 10, 2005 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
December 08, 2004 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Entire Action | |
November 16, 2004 | Docket Event | Arbitration-Status Conference | |
November 16, 2004 | Docket Event | Notice | |
October 01, 2004 | Docket Event | Notice | |
September 27, 2004 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 27, 2004 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
September 20, 2004 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Statement | |
September 07, 2004 | Docket Event | Consent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.