Case Last Refreshed: 19 hours ago
The People Of The State Of California,, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Actavis Llc, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance Llc, Allergan Finance, Llc, Allergan Plc, (total of 19) See All in the jurisdiction of Orange County, CA, . Orange County, CA Superior Courts with Peter J. Wilson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePeter J. Wilson Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 21, 2014 |
CategoryBusiness Tort |
|
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1281 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
|
CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER PERK, STEVEN ON 05/21/2014.
Date: 2014-05-21T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (RE MOTION TO SEAL) RECEIVED ON 05/21/2014.
Date: 2014-05-21T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (RE MOTION TO SEAL) RECEIVED ON 06/09/2014.
Date: 2014-06-09T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (PERMITTING STEVE W. BERMAN TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE) RECEIVED ON 06/11/2014.
Date: 2014-06-11T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (PERMITTING JENNIFER FOUNTAIN CONNOLLY TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE) RECEIVED ON 06/11/2014.
Date: 2014-06-11T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/24/2014.
Date: 2014-06-24T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/18/2014 03:48:00 PM.
Date: 2014-06-18T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED
Date: 2014-06-18T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/11/2014
Date: 2014-07-11T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CEPHALON, INC.; TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ON 07/14/2014
Date: 2014-07-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY CEPHALON, INC.; TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ON 07/14/2014
Date: 2014-07-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4215833 REJECTED.
Date: 2014-07-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1178713 REJECTED.
Date: 2014-07-17T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/16/2014 04:22:00 PM.
Date: 2014-07-16T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/15/2014
Date: 2014-07-15T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4215832 REJECTED.
Date: 2014-07-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4215834 REJECTED.
Date: 2014-07-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1178712 REJECTED.
Date: 2014-07-17T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/01/2014 04:11:00 PM.
Date: 2014-12-02T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1178711 REJECTED.
Date: 2014-07-17T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED
Date: 2014-12-02T00:00:00CASE REASSIGNED TO THIERRY COLAW EFFECTIVE 01/05/2015.
Date: 2014-12-12T00:00:00ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/12/2014
Date: 2014-12-12T00:00:00RECEIPT OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/12/2014
Date: 2014-12-12T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3226847 REJECTED.
Date: 2014-12-16T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY ACTAVIS, PLC; ACTAVIS, INC. ON 12/12/2014
Date: 2014-12-12T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/16/2014
Date: 2014-12-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4301293 REJECTED.
Date: 2014-12-30T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/29/2014
Date: 2014-12-29T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 02/24/2015
Date: 2015-02-24T00:00:00APPENDIX OF AUTHORITIES FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 02/24/2015
Date: 2015-02-24T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 02/24/2015
Date: 2015-02-24T00:00:00APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE (JASON DRORI) FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 04/10/2015
Date: 2015-04-10T00:00:00APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE (JAMES W. MATTHEWS) FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 04/10/2015
Date: 2015-04-10T00:00:00APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE (KATY KOSKI) FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 04/10/2015
Date: 2015-04-10T00:00:00APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE (WILLIAM POTTER) FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 04/10/2015
Date: 2015-04-10T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 04/28/2015
Date: 2015-04-28T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER FILED BY ACTAVIS, PLC; ACTAVIS, INC. ON 04/28/2015
Date: 2015-04-28T00:00:00REPLY TO MOTION FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 04/28/2015
Date: 2015-04-28T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 04/28/2015
Date: 2015-04-28T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER FILED BY CEPHALON, INC.; TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ON 04/28/2015
Date: 2015-04-28T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CEPHALON, INC.; TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ON 04/28/2015
Date: 2015-04-28T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY CEPHALON, INC.; TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ON 04/28/2015
Date: 2015-04-28T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3256203 REJECTED.
Date: 2015-04-29T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3256204 REJECTED.
Date: 2015-04-29T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/29/2015
Date: 2015-04-29T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/07/2015 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2015-05-07T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2015-05-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/08/2015 02:57:00 PM.
Date: 2015-05-08T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED
Date: 2015-05-08T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2015-05-11T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 05/08/2015 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2015-05-11T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2015-05-11 09:30:00.0.
Date: 2015-05-11T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/19/2015 10:13:00 AM.
Date: 2015-05-19T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3256211 REJECTED.
Date: 2015-05-26T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3256212 REJECTED.
Date: 2015-05-26T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/20/2015
Date: 2015-05-20T00:00:00ORDER - OTHER (PRO HAC VICE) FILED BY ACTAVIS, PLC; ACTAVIS, INC. ON 05/21/2015
Date: 2015-05-21T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4333726 REJECTED.
Date: 2015-05-26T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/28/2015
Date: 2015-05-28T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4333740 REJECTED.
Date: 2015-05-26T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3283142 REJECTED.
Date: 2015-05-26T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4333757 REJECTED.
Date: 2015-05-29T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4333749 REJECTED.
Date: 2015-05-29T00:00:00MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE FILED BY BURNS, R.D. ON 07/25/2016
Date: 2016-07-25T00:00:00COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION (PROPOSED) RECEIVED ON 07/25/2016.
Date: 2016-07-25T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BURNS, R.D. ON 07/25/2016
Date: 2016-07-25T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/25/2016
Date: 2016-07-25T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2467965 REJECTED.
Date: 2016-07-28T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4556966 REJECTED.
Date: 2016-07-28T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 07/27/2016 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2016-07-27T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET SUBMITTED BY BURNS, R.D. REJECTED ON 07/26/2016.
Date: 2016-07-26T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/26/2016
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4581260 REJECTED.
Date: 2016-09-28T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PURDUE PHARMA L.P.; THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC ON 09/23/2016
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3451165 REJECTED.
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 10/19/2016 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PURDUE PHARMA L.P.; THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC ON 10/17/2016
Date: 2016-10-17T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3483436 REJECTED.
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/27/2016
Date: 2016-11-27T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/30/2016
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4597721 REJECTED.
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE FILED BY BURNS, R.D. ON 11/30/2016
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION (PROPOSED) RECEIVED ON 11/30/2016.
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY BURNS, RD ON 11/30/2016
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY PURDUE PHARMA L.P.; THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC ON 01/11/2017
Date: 2017-01-11T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY BURNS, R.D. ON 01/17/2017
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PURDUE PHARMA L.P.; THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC ON 01/11/2017
Date: 2017-01-11T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2017-01-12T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY BURNS, R.D. ON 01/17/2017
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/12/2017 10:13:00 AM.
Date: 2017-01-12T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2017-01-30T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/30/2017 02:01:00 PM.
Date: 2017-01-30T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4640491 REJECTED.
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 02/09/2017 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4642204 REJECTED.
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 03/13/2017 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2017-03-13T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/13/2017
Date: 2017-04-13T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/14/2017 03:33:00 PM.
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/01/2017
Date: 2017-06-01T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/05/2017 10:49:00 AM.
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 2017-07-28 10:00:00.0.
Date: 2017-08-01T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/24/2017 03:04:00 PM.
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE (TIMOTHY W. KNAPP) FILED BY ACTAVIS, INC. ON 09/06/2017
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE (MARTIN L. ROTH) FILED BY ACTAVIS, INC. ON 09/06/2017
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ACTAVIS, INC.; ACTAVIS, PLC; WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 09/06/2017.
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ACTAVIS, INC. ON 09/06/2017.
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/08/2017
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/07/2017
Date: 2017-09-07T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/08/2017
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/11/2017 02:50:00 PM.
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ACTAVIS, PLC; ACTAVIS, INC. ON 09/08/2017
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA FILED BY ACTAVIS, PLC; ACTAVIS, INC. ON 09/08/2017
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00DEMURRER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY ACTAVIS, PLC; ACTAVIS, INC. ON 09/08/2017
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ACTAVIS, PLC; ACTAVIS, INC. ON 09/08/2017
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00APPENDIX OF AUTHORITIES FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 09/08/2017
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 09/08/2017
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 09/08/2017
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4294749 REJECTED.
Date: 2015-01-14T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/21/2015
Date: 2015-01-21T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED
Date: 2015-01-16T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/16/2015 03:35:00 PM.
Date: 2015-01-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1228334 REJECTED.
Date: 2015-02-09T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/06/2015
Date: 2015-02-06T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/19/2015
Date: 2015-02-19T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/20/2015
Date: 2015-02-20T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY PURDUE PHARMA L.P.; PURDUE, INC.; PURDUE PHARMA, INC. ON 02/19/2015
Date: 2015-02-19T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/24/2015
Date: 2015-02-24T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 02/23/2015 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2015-02-23T00:00:00MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS (RENEWED) FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 02/24/2015
Date: 2015-02-24T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. ON 02/24/2015
Date: 2015-02-24T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 02/24/2015
Date: 2015-02-24T00:00:00MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. ON 02/24/2015
Date: 2015-02-24T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 03/12/2018
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/12/2018
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 2018-03-09 13:30:00.0.
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/16/2018 02:19:00 PM.
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 03/19/2018
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 03/19/2018
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/23/2018
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/26/2018
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/20/2018
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 03/23/2018 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 05/03/2018
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/07/2018
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/09/2018 09:14:00 AM.
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/04/2018
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. ON 05/07/2018
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/10/2018 03:17:00 PM.
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/07/2018.
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00MOTION TO QUASH (SERVICE OF PROCESS) FILED BY TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. ON 05/07/2018
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/21/2018 03:55:00 PM.
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/01/2018
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/04/2018 04:04:00 PM.
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT 06/08/2018 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2662907 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1512404 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/22/2018
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4856561 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3677149 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/09/2018
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00CASE REASSIGNED TO PETER WILSON EFFECTIVE 07/30/2018.
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/26/2018 08:25:00 AM.
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 07/10/2018
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/10/2018
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00DEMURRER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY ACTAVIS, INC.; WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 07/09/2018
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 07/09/2018
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 07/09/2018
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/11/2018 04:14:00 PM.
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.; JOHNSON & JOHNSON ON 07/09/2018
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/09/2018.
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC; ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.; WATSON LABORATORIES, INC. ON 07/09/2018
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY CEPHALON, INC.; TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. ON 07/09/2018
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/02/2015
Date: 2015-06-02T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4333758 REJECTED.
Date: 2015-05-29T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4333678 REJECTED.
Date: 2015-05-29T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4333679 REJECTED.
Date: 2015-05-29T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4333748 REJECTED.
Date: 2015-05-29T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3256215 REJECTED.
Date: 2015-05-29T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4333725 REJECTED.
Date: 2015-05-29T00:00:00NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 06/04/2015
Date: 2015-06-04T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3283143 REJECTED.
Date: 2015-06-23T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/04/2015
Date: 2015-08-04T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/05/2015 01:34:00 PM.
Date: 2015-08-05T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2379944 REJECTED.
Date: 2015-08-27T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1260497 REJECTED.
Date: 2015-08-27T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO QUASH 2015-08-27 13:30:00.0.
Date: 2015-08-27T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1260498 REJECTED.
Date: 2015-08-27T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1260499 REJECTED.
Date: 2015-08-27T00:00:00CASE REASSIGNED TO WILLIAM CLASTER EFFECTIVE 01/11/2016.
Date: 2015-12-14T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2016-03-15T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/15/2016 11:40:00 AM.
Date: 2016-03-15T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/07/2016 03:24:00 PM.
Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/16/2016
Date: 2016-05-16T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 05/11/2016 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2016-05-11T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/03/2016
Date: 2016-06-03T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY PURDUE PHARMA L.P.; THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC ON 07/01/2016
Date: 2016-07-01T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PURDUE PHARMA L.P.; THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC ON 07/01/2016
Date: 2016-07-01T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY BURNS, R.D. ON 07/25/2016
Date: 2016-07-25T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.; WATSON LABORATORIES, INC. ON 07/09/2018
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3686796 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/13/2018
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00OBJECTION (AND RESPONSES TO NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION) FILED BY ACTAVIS, INC. ON 07/30/2018
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00RESPONSE (TO EX PARTE APPLICATION) FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 08/01/2018
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/01/2018
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1525511 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 08/01/2018 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3693653 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/07/2018 02:59:00 PM.
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/07/2018 01:41:00 PM.
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/10/2018
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/23/2018 10:51:00 AM.
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/15/2018 03:15:00 PM.
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/24/2018 09:43:00 AM.
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE 08/23/2018 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/27/2018
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE) FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 08/27/2018
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/30/2018
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 09/04/2018
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE 09/06/2018 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 09/06/2018 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4871807 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3697710 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4875586 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY ACTAVIS, PLC; ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 09/06/2018
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3697711 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2697194 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/12/2018
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/10/2018 10:39:00 AM.
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/13/2018
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4886187 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/13/2018
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00REPLY TO MOTION FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 09/12/2018
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 09/12/2018
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/17/2018 11:33:00 AM.
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1529174 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER (APPEARANCE) FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 09/12/2018
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER (OF CHRISTOPHER W. SMITH) FILED BY ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY ON 09/13/2018
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA FILED BY ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY ON 09/13/2018
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4872162 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER (OF TONETA SNYDER) FILED BY ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY ON 09/13/2018
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY ON 09/13/2018
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3704231 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1535700 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1534253 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2700867 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4882110 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4882111 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3704232 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2700865 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2707378 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 09/21/2018.
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/03/2018
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ACTAVIS LLC ON 10/02/2018
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/12/2017 02:09:00 PM.
Date: 2017-09-12T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2017-09-12T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/06/2017
Date: 2017-10-06T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/17/2017
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER (IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER) FILED BY ACTAVIS, PLC; ACTAVIS, INC. ON 11/17/2017
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1442165 REJECTED.
Date: 2017-11-20T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/21/2017
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 11/22/2017 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1442841 REJECTED.
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/30/2017
Date: 2017-11-30T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/30/2017
Date: 2017-11-30T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/22/2017 03:04:00 PM.
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/08/2017 09:19:00 AM.
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2017-12-12T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/12/2017 10:35:00 AM.
Date: 2017-12-12T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 01/02/2018
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE 12/27/2017 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/12/2018
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 01/02/2018.
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/22/2018 11:49:00 AM.
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 01/04/2018
Date: 2018-01-04T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 01/26/2018 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/22/2018 04:05:00 PM.
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/02/2018
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3632883 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 02/13/2018 09:15:00 AM.
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/09/2018 09:28:00 AM.
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/15/2018 10:05:00 AM.
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/16/2018
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/20/2018 10:44:00 AM.
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/14/2018
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3585338 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1418873 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2591055 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2591048 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2591004 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3585390 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2591053 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1418868 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2591035 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/26/2018 10:55:00 AM.
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4766003 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4821125 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ACTAVIS LLC ON 10/02/2018
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/05/2018
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE RECEIVED ON 11/06/2018.
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY ACTAVIS, PLC; ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 11/07/2018
Date: 2018-11-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 2018-11-09 09:00:00.0.
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER FILED BY TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. ON 11/09/2018
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. ON 11/09/2018
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ACTAVIS, PLC; ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 11/14/2018
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00OPPOSITION (TO MOTION TO COMPEL) FILED BY ACTAVIS, PLC; ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 11/14/2018
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER (IN SUPPORT OF ALLERGAN) FILED BY ACTAVIS, PLC; ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 11/14/2018
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2018-11-15 13:49:00.0.
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 11/14/2018
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/20/2018
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 11/19/2018
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY CEPHALON, INC. ON 11/19/2018
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ON 11/19/2018
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 11/19/2018
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3718632 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2718839 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2718840 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/27/2018
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/29/2018
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3723699 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4904917 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4904926 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2730161 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1555138 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3723698 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/07/2018
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 12/13/2018
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 12/13/2018
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00REPLY TO MOTION FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 12/13/2018
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 12/13/2018
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 12/13/2018
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2668466 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 12/20/2018 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00ORDER - OTHER FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 01/03/2019
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/14/2019
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00REPORT OF REFEREE (ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION) FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 01/18/2019
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/22/2019
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3708959 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 01/24/2019 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/25/2019 11:09:00 AM.
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/31/2019 03:31:00 PM.
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/04/2019 07:45:00 AM.
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/08/2019 03:45:00 PM.
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ACTAVIS, PLC; WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 10/05/2017
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 09/27/2017 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 09/15/2017
Date: 2017-09-15T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3587288 REJECTED.
Date: 2017-09-15T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 10/12/2017 09:54:00 AM.
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/18/2018
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3687958 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1519451 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00REQUEST - OTHER (FOR SERVICE ABROAD OF JUDICIAL OR EXTRAJUDICIAL DOCUMENTS) RECEIVED ON 07/13/2018.
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/20/2018 03:10:00 PM.
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/31/2018
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 02/11/2019 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/08/2019
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1589721 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2780470 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 04/11/2019 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3771122 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3765412 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3765356 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/19/2019
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/18/2019
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 04/19/2019
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 04/19/2019
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/25/2019 08:14:00 AM.
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/29/2019
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4964074 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00REPORT OF REFEREE (ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION) FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 05/07/2019
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/10/2019
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/09/2019
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/13/2019 03:50:00 PM.
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/13/2019 01:53:00 PM.
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3777265 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE 05/09/2019 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE 2019-05-16 10:00:00.0.
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE 2019-05-16 10:00:00.0.
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/20/2019
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 05/17/2019
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 05/20/2019
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 05/17/2019
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/21/2019 08:19:00 AM.
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3782853 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1621697 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1625046 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1621854 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER (QUALIFIED PROTECTED ORDER) FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 05/21/2019
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK - SUBMITTED MATTER 05/21/2019 11:33:00 AM.
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/21/2019
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 05/21/2019
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 05/21/2019
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/24/2019
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL IN JCCP 5029
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00ORDER IN JCCP 5029
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00PLAINTIFF'S PETITION FOR COORDINATION AND MOTION TO STAY OF CITY AND COUNTY OPIOID CASES
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PETITION FOR COORDINATION)
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PETITION FOR COORDINATION
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION MOTION JUDGE)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00ORDER - OTHER RECEIVED ON 05/24/2019.
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION MOTION JUDGE
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/28/2019
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2799085 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3796147 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 05/30/2019.
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3796157 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/10/2019
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE 06/06/2019 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3800760 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE 06/13/2019 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1632769 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 06/13/2019
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER (BRIEF) FILED BY TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. ON 10/03/2018
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER (OF COLLIE F. JAMES, IV) FILED BY TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. ON 10/03/2018
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00SUPPLEMENTAL (BRIEF IN OPPOSITION) FILED BY TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. ON 10/03/2018
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER (IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER) FILED BY TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. ON 10/03/2018
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. ON 10/03/2018
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/12/2018
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/11/2018
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00MOTION TO COMPEL FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 10/03/2018
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 10/03/2018
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 10/03/2018
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 10/18/2018 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3685968 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4863845 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4863836 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4863830 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/25/2018
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3686120 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1554393 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4863848 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 10/30/2018 11:03:00 AM.
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/01/2018
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/03/2019
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/10/2019
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1640349 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1642668 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00REPORT OF REFEREE (ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION) FILED BY ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. ON 07/17/2019
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 07/25/2019 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. ON 07/29/2019
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/01/2019 11:45:00 AM.
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00REPORT OF REFEREE (ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION) (#8) FILED BY ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. ON 07/31/2019
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4997477 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1657194 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2808367 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4983206 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/08/2019 02:19:00 PM.
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 09/05/2019.
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/17/2019.
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/18/2019 11:36:00 AM.
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND ON 09/17/2019
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND ON 09/17/2019
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND ON 09/17/2019
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 10/01/2019
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 10/01/2019
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 10/01/2019
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00MOTION TO COMPEL (COMPLIANCE WITH R&R NO. 1) FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 10/10/2019
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 2019-10-10 10:00:00.0.
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 10/10/2019
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/17/2019
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY PURDUE PHARMA L.P.; PURDUE PHARMA, INC. ON 10/15/2019
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 10/10/2019
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 10/17/2019
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE 10/17/2019 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLERGAN PLC ON 10/31/2019
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REPLY (DECLARATION OF KARL STAMPFL) FILED BY ALLERGAN PLC ON 10/31/2019
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00REPLY TO MOTION (TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SECOND SET OF DISCOVERY) FILED BY ALLERGAN PLC ON 10/31/2019
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/14/2019
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/18/2019
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 02/20/2019
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 02/20/2019
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/21/2019
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 02/20/2019
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 02/22/2019
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 03/01/2019
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/01/2019
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 03/01/2019
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/04/2019 02:02:00 PM.
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 03/07/2019 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 03/08/2019
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/18/2019
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 03/21/2019
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/03/2019
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 03/21/2019
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. ON 04/03/2019
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1689669 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3858011 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00REPORT OF REFEREE (ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION) (NO. 4) FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 11/19/2019
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3856895 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/22/2019
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 11/22/2019
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 11/22/2019
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/27/2019
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE 11/21/2019 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 2019-11-21 10:00:00.0.
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/02/2019
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/03/2019
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/09/2019
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 12/09/2019
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 12/09/2019
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00SUPPLEMENTAL (DECLARATION OF MARK D. FISHER) FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 12/09/2019
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 12/09/2019
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/10/2019
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 12/10/2019
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 12/10/2019
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/11/2019
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY BURNS, R.D. ON 12/12/2019
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY BURNS, R.D. ON 12/12/2019
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/18/2019
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/21/2019
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/27/2019
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4985148 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/02/2019
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4986500 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1640129 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00ORDER SUPPLEMENTING/MODIFYING STIPULATED QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR PROTECTED HEALTH INFORMATION
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 12/19/2019 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/23/2019
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/23/2019
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/27/2019
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41040195 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41048224 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (JAMS) FILED BY OFFICE OF THE COUNTY COUNSEL OF SANTA CLARA ON 12/30/2019
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION (JAMS) FILED BY OFFICE OF THE COUNTY COUNSEL OF SANTA CLARA ON 12/30/2019
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY COUNTY OF MARIN, CALIFORNIA; COUNTY OF SAN LUIS OBISPO, CALIFORNIA ON 01/03/2020
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00REPORT OF REFEREE (ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION) FILED BY ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. ON 01/06/2020
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2877911 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/09/2020 01:21:00 PM.
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00REPLY TO MOTION FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 01/09/2020
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 01/09/2020
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 01/09/2020
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2879575 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/13/2020
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00REPORT OF REFEREE (ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION) FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 01/10/2020
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00REPORT OF REFEREE (ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION) FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 01/14/2020
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 2020-01-16 10:00:00.0.
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41044320 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/16/2020 04:30:00 PM.
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2864727 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41043040 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2865087 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00REPORT OF REFEREE (ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION) FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 01/16/2020
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/17/2020
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00ORDER - OTHER FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 01/17/2020
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41038089 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 01/17/2020
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 01/17/2020
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00MOTION TO COMPEL (HEARD BY DISCOVERY REFEREE) FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 01/17/2020
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41055792 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/28/2020
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00MOTION TO COMPEL (JAMS) FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 01/24/2020
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 01/24/2020
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00OBJECTION FILED BY OFFICE OF THE COUNTY COUNSEL OF SANTA CLARA ON 01/28/2020
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 01/28/2020
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 01/28/2020
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 01/28/2020
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 01/28/2020
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3882494 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 01/29/2020
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 01/29/2020
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/29/2020 03:37:00 PM.
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/29/2020
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00REPLY TO MOTION FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 01/29/2020
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 01/29/2020 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 01/29/2020
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3882657 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 01/30/2020
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 01/30/2020
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41059351 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 01/30/2020
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2886214 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 01/30/2020
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00OBJECTION FILED BY ANAHEIM BLUE CROSS LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/30/2020
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 01/30/2020
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 01/30/2020
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/30/2020
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/30/2020
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/30/2020
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/31/2020 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3881803 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00RESPONSE (TO OBJECTIONS) FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 12/16/2019
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 12/16/2019
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/20/2019 04:30:00 PM.
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT - OTHER FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 02/03/2020
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2886759 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/04/2020
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00APPLICATION - OTHER (FOR ISSUANCE OF COMMISSION) FILED BY JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 02/04/2020
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00STIPULATION - OTHER FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 02/04/2020
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00COMMISSION (ISSUED 2/5/2020) RECEIVED ON 02/04/2020.
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00STIPULATION - OTHER FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 02/05/2020
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/05/2020
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/05/2020 09:10:00 AM.
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3882670 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41060680 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/06/2020
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00STIPULATION - OTHER FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 02/06/2020
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/06/2020 10:02:00 AM.
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00REPORT OF REFEREE (ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION) FILED BY ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. ON 02/06/2020
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3885054 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/06/2020
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/06/2020
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/06/2020
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE, LLC ON 02/06/2020
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY ALAMEDA COUNTY FIRE DISTRICT; COUNTY OF ALAMEDA ON 02/07/2020
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ALAMEDA COUNTY FIRE DISTRICT; COUNTY OF ALAMEDA ON 02/07/2020
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY JOHNSON & JOHNSON ON 02/07/2020
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY JOHNSON & JOHNSON ON 02/07/2020
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JOHNSON & JOHNSON ON 02/07/2020
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00REPORT OF REFEREE (ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION) FILED BY ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. ON 02/07/2020
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2020-02-10 10:01:00.0.
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 02/11/2020
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 02/11/2020
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1716342 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/14/2020 07:59:00 AM.
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00DOCUMENT - OTHER (RE: RR NO. 17) FILED BY CALIFORNIA STATE BOARD OF PHARMACY ON 02/13/2020
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1712547 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/14/2020 10:47:00 AM.
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 02/13/2020 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41063567 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2891849 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00DOCUMENT - OTHER RECEIVED ON 02/14/2020.
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00ORDER - OTHER FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 02/14/2020
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.; JOHNSON & JOHNSON ON 02/18/2020
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 02/18/2020
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 02/18/2020
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 02/18/2020
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 01/17/2020
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 01/17/2020
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 01/22/2020
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00REPORT OF REFEREE (ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION) FILED BY ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. ON 01/21/2020
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00REPLY TO MOTION FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 01/22/2020
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/23/2020
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 01/24/2020
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 01/23/2020
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 01/24/2020
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/24/2020
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/24/2020
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 01/24/2020
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2884068 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/27/2020
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER (OF JENNIFER D. WELLMAN) FILED BY STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND ON 01/27/2020
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00OPPOSITION (TO MOTION TO COMPEL) FILED BY STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND ON 01/27/2020
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1709964 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC; ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 02/25/2020
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/25/2020
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/25/2020
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3885916 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 2020-02-26 10:00:00.0.
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 2020-02-26 13:30:00.0.
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/27/2020 08:53:00 AM.
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR 02/27/2020 08:37:00 AM.
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/27/2020 10:44:00 AM.
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/27/2020 11:01:00 AM.
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 02/27/2020 10:34:00 AM.
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/27/2020 11:17:00 AM.
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/27/2020 11:36:00 AM.
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/27/2020 11:10:00 AM.
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/27/2020 02:57:00 PM.
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3892407 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1712705 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/05/2020 11:42:00 AM.
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/05/2020
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/06/2020
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1728109 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2020-03-09 11:24:00.0.
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1729025 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/09/2020
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/10/2020
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/10/2020
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00REPORT OF REFEREE (ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION) (NO. 43) FILED BY ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. ON 03/12/2020
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00REPORT OF REFEREE (ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION) (NO. 45) FILED BY ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. ON 03/12/2020
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/12/2020
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00REPORT OF REFEREE (ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION) (NO.44) FILED BY ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. ON 03/12/2020
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00REPORT OF REFEREE (ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION) (#46) FILED BY ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. ON 03/12/2020
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00REPORT OF REFEREE (ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION) (NO. 47) FILED BY ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. ON 03/12/2020
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 03/13/2020
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 03/13/2020
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/03/2020 10:51:00 AM.
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/03/2020 02:49:00 PM.
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 01/30/2020 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE
Date: 2020-05-15T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2903855 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3900318 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41078462 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41076989 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00REPORT OF REFEREE (ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION) (NO. 49) FILED BY ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. ON 05/26/2020
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00REPORT OF REFEREE (ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION) (NO. 48) FILED BY ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. ON 05/26/2020
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1730736 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ALAMEDA COUNTY FIRE DISTRICT; COUNTY OF ALAMEDA ON 05/29/2020
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/01/2020 02:27:00 PM.
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00OBJECTION FILED BY ALAMEDA COUNTY FIRE DISTRICT; COUNTY OF ALAMEDA ON 05/29/2020
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/03/2020 08:50:00 AM.
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00DOCUMENT - OTHER (PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE) RECEIVED ON 05/26/2020.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00APPENDIX OF AUTHORITIES RECEIVED ON 05/26/2020.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (DECLARATION OF KARL STAMPFL) FILED BY ALLERGAN PLC ON 05/28/2020
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION (JAMS) FILED BY ALLERGAN PLC ON 05/28/2020
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY ALLERGAN PLC ON 05/28/2020
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ALLERGAN PLC ON 05/28/2020
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/09/2020 02:42:00 PM.
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY OFFICE OF THE COUNTY COUNSEL - COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES ON 06/11/2020
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 06/17/2020
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 06/17/2020
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 06/17/2020
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. ON 06/17/2020
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. ON 06/17/2020
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 06/18/2020
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY ALAMEDA COUNTY FIRE DISTRICT; COUNTY OF ALAMEDA ON 06/18/2020
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/19/2020
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ALAMEDA COUNTY FIRE DISTRICT; COUNTY OF ALAMEDA ON 06/23/2020.
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/24/2020 10:02:00 AM.
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER (RENEWAL -PRO HAC VICE - KARL STAMPEL) FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 06/24/2020
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 2020-06-25 14:00:00.0.
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/19/2020 10:33:00 AM.
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 02/19/2020.
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 2020-02-13 10:00:00.0.
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00RESPONSE FILED BY ALAMEDA COUNTY FIRE DISTRICT; COUNTY OF ALAMEDA ON 02/20/2020
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 02/20/2020 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 02/20/2020
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/20/2020
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 02/20/2020
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 02/20/2020
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 02/20/2020
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY COUNTY OF MARIN, CALIFORNIA ON 02/21/2020
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY MEDICAL BOARD OF CALIFORNIA ON 02/21/2020
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/24/2020
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3878518 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/24/2020
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00RESPONSE (TO OBJECTIONS TO DISCOVERY) FILED BY ALLERGAN PLC; ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 06/29/2020
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLERGAN PLC; ALLERGAN FINANCE, LLC ON 06/29/2020
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 07/06/2020
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 2020-07-06 11:05:00.0.
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/07/2020
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ALLERGAN PLC; ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 07/10/2020
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/10/2020
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY - PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR ON 07/10/2020
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00RESPONSE FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY - PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR ON 07/10/2020
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY - PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR ON 07/10/2020
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41063882 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3885913 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY - PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR ON 07/13/2020.
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2868494 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 07/14/2020 11:01:00 AM.
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 07/09/2020 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/14/2020 10:48:00 AM.
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41092577 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1717628 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00ORDER - OTHER (RE TUCKER HUNTER'S PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION) FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 07/14/2020
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY - PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR ON 07/14/2020
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2889141 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1717630 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1696885 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00ORDER GRANTING (RE PAUL J. WEEK'S PRO HAC VICE) FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 07/14/2020
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/16/2020
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/15/2020
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3918041 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER FILED BY TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. ON 07/24/2020
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. ON 07/24/2020
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/21/2020.
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. ON 07/24/2020
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 07/29/2020.
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 07/29/2020
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 07/29/2020
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 07/31/2020.
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 07/31/2020
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 07/31/2020
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 08/05/2020
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/05/2020 07:47:00 AM.
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/06/2020
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00OBJECTION FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY - PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR ON 08/06/2020
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY - PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR ON 08/06/2020
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY - PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR ON 08/06/2020
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 08/06/2020
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. ON 08/06/2020
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 08/06/2020
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. ON 08/06/2020
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (KARL STAMPFL) FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 08/07/2020
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 08/07/2020
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00MOTION TO COMPEL (ADDITIONAL CLAIMS DATE FIELD) FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 08/07/2020
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00D077440, D077441, D077442, D077443 ORDER
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/11/2020 09:46:00 AM.
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/11/2020
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2903326 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY ALLERGAN PLC; ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 03/16/2020
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/17/2020 10:13:00 AM.
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/18/2020
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/17/2020 01:59:00 PM.
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/14/2020
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 08/11/2020.
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/03/2020
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 09/03/2020.
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/03/2020
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION 2020-09-03 14:00:00.0.
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/04/2020
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 09/04/2020
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 09/04/2020 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 09/08/2020
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00ORDER - OTHER (AGREED ORDER) FILED BY ALLERGAN PLC; ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 09/08/2020
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2937054 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2937458 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2020-09-08 15:20:00.0.
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41112173 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 09/09/2020 09:31:00 AM.
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3925949 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/11/2020
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 09/09/2020.
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2930614 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION 2020-09-10 14:00:00.0.
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1759464 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00REPORT OF REFEREE (ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION) (NO 16) FILED BY ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. ON 09/15/2020
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2937151 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 09/28/2020
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/29/2020
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 10/02/2020
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 10/06/2020
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/07/2020
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 2020-10-02 10:00:00.0.
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00REPORT OF REFEREE (ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION) (#52) FILED BY ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. ON 10/09/2020
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 10/13/2020
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00REPORT OF REFEREE (ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION) (#54) FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 10/16/2020
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00REPORT OF REFEREE (ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION) (#53) FILED BY ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. ON 10/16/2020
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 06/30/2020
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ALLERGAN PLC; ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 06/29/2020
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 07/01/2020.
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. ON 07/02/2020
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ON 07/02/2020
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY COUNTY OF SAN LUIS OBISPO, CALIFORNIA ON 07/06/2020
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00REPORT OF REFEREE (ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION) (NO. 55) FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 10/21/2020
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 10/22/2020
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/22/2020
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 2020-11-20 10:00:00.0.
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 12/03/2020
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/04/2020
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41139396 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/08/2020
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2964726 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 12/10/2020
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/10/2020
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 12/10/2020 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC; WATSON LABORATORIES, INC. ON 12/16/2020
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO STRIKE 2020-12-17 10:00:00.0.
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2963945 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/29/2020
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 12/24/2020
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING EXPERT DISCOVERY DEADLINES
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41144806 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/04/2021
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/11/2021
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY CEPHALON, INC.; TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ON 01/11/2021
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY CEPHALON, INC.; TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ON 01/11/2021
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY CEPHALON, INC.; TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ON 01/11/2021
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/12/2021
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/12/2020
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/14/2020 12:20:00 PM.
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 08/14/2020
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/14/2020
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 2020-08-17 10:00:00.0.
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 2020-08-13 14:00:00.0.
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/18/2020 04:10:00 PM.
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 2020-08-12 10:00:00.0.
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00D077795 ORDER
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00D077794 ORDER
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 08/26/2020
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 08/27/2020
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 08/26/2020
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER (IN SUPPORT) FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 08/27/2020
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 08/27/2020
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 08/27/2020
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 08/27/2020
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/27/2020
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 08/28/2020.
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER FILED BY OFFICE OF THE COUNTY COUNSEL - COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES ON 08/31/2020
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (KARL STAMPFL) FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 09/01/2020
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 09/01/2020
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/28/2021
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/29/2021
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1807804 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/02/2021
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 02/02/2021
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE 2021-01-29 13:30:00.0.
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 02/02/2021
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00ORDER D077440
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/03/2021
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 02/03/2021
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 02/03/2021
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2973945 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00REPORT OF REFEREE (ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION) (#60) FILED BY ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. ON 02/04/2021
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 02/04/2021 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 02/10/2021
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE FILED BY ALLERGAN PLC; ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 02/10/2021
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER (OF ZACHARY BYER) FILED BY ALLERGAN PLC; ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 02/10/2021
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/11/2021
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/12/2021
Date: 2021-02-12T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2984035 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1812672 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2984014 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3980790 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3980772 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3980786 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1812526 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1812480 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1812520 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41158697 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3980960 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3980958 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41158881 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1812539 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2984010 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41158882 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41158883 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41158867 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1812664 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3980965 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3980802 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1812680 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1812683 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3980959 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41158864 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41158754 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3980963 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3980832 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2984166 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3980962 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3980967 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1812666 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1812560 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1812677 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3980969 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41158877 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2984182 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41158875 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41158880 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3980970 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3980972 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41159170 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3980971 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2984185 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2984184 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41158884 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3980973 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 10/29/2020
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 11/05/2020 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41118873 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 11/12/2020
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 11/16/2020
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00REPORT OF REFEREE (ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION) FILED BY ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. ON 11/13/2020
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00ORDER D077794 AND D077795
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 02/16/2021
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/19/2021
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 02/19/2021
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 02/19/2021
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/20/2021
Date: 2021-02-20T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (PUBLIC VERSION) FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 02/19/2021
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION (PUBLIC VERSION MIL) FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 02/19/2021
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/22/2021 08:08:00 AM.
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 02/19/2021
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (FILED UNDER SEAL) FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 02/19/2021
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING (UNDER SEAL DEFENDANT'S MIL) FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 02/19/2021
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (FILED UNDER SEAL) FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 02/19/2021
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/22/2021 10:27:00 AM.
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 02/19/2021
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION (MIL (PUBLIC VIEW)) FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 02/19/2021
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 02/19/2021
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 02/19/2021
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 02/19/2021
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 02/19/2021
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 02/19/2021
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 02/19/2021
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 02/19/2021
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER (MIL) FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 02/19/2021
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 02/22/2021
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/23/2021 09:46:00 AM.
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 02/24/2021.
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/24/2021
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 02/24/2021
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 02/24/2021.
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 02/25/2021 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 02/26/2021
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00REPLY TO MOTION FILED BY CEPHALON, INC.; TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ON 02/26/2021
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY CEPHALON, INC.; TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ON 02/26/2021
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 02/26/2021
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/14/2021
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE 01/14/2021 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/14/2021 09:40:00 AM.
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00OPINION D077440, D077441, D077442, D077443
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER (WITH EXHIBITS) RECEIVED ON 01/15/2021.
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/15/2021
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER (ROA'S NUMBERS) FILED BY CEPHALON, INC.; TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ON 01/15/2021
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 01/20/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41149459 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE 01/21/2021 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/21/2021
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY ALLERGAN PLC; ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 01/22/2021
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/26/2021 01:12:00 PM.
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 03/01/2021
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 03/05/2021
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 03/05/2021
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00RESPONSE FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 03/05/2021
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 03/05/2021
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 03/05/2021
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 03/08/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3987665 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER (OF ROA NUMBERS) FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 03/08/2021
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/08/2021
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 03/08/2021.
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 03/08/2021
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 03/09/2021
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 03/10/2021
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2992871 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/19/2021 01:08:00 PM.
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 03/12/2021
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 03/12/2021
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/12/2021
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 03/12/2021
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 03/12/2021
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 03/12/2021
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 03/12/2021
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (FILED UNDER SEAL) FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 03/12/2021
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER (FILE UNDER SEAL) FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 03/12/2021
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER (FILED UNDER SEAL) FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 03/12/2021
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER (FILE UNDER SEAL) FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 03/12/2021
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER FILED BY ALLERGAN PLC; ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 03/12/2021
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLERGAN PLC; ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 03/12/2021
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER (MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION - FILED UNDER SEAL) FILED BY ALLERGAN PLC ON 03/12/2021
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER (OF ZACHARY BYER-FILED UNDER SEAL) FILED BY ALLERGAN PLC ON 03/12/2021
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ON 03/15/2021
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3990818 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/16/2021 11:59:00 AM.
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 03/15/2021.
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER (OF INDEX OF MOTIONS IN LIMINE) FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 03/16/2021
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3970294 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1801741 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3970298 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2973504 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1801998 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3980964 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2984160 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2983931 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2983968 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41158860 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2984180 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3980968 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 03/15/2021
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00ORDER D077794
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41158666 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00RESPONSE FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 03/18/2021
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 03/18/2021
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/01/2021 01:56:00 PM.
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 03/01/2021
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 03/03/2021.
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE 2021-02-26 14:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3986923 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/03/2021
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER (AMENDED) FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 03/04/2021
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/05/2021
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/18/2021
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 04/08/2021 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/09/2021 10:56:00 AM.
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 04/09/2021.
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 04/09/2021
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 04/12/2021
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.; JOHNSON & JOHNSON ON 04/12/2021
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 04/12/2021
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 04/12/2021
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 04/12/2021
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00MEDIA REQUEST TO PHOTOGRAPH, RECORD OR BROADCAST
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00ORDER ON MEDIA REQUEST TO PERMIT COVERAGE
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 04/14/2021
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 04/14/2021
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 04/14/2021
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21006982 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (RE JOINT TRIAL BRIEF) FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 04/14/2021
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 04/15/2021
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 04/15/2021
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 04/15/2021
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/16/2021 02:39:00 PM.
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 04/16/2021
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2021-04-16 13:48:00.0.
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 04/19/2021
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 04/19/2021
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00ORDER ON MEDIA REQUEST TO PERMIT COVERAGE
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00ORDER ON MEDIA REQUEST TO PERMIT COVERAGE
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION 2021-03-12 10:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/21/2021 11:57:00 AM.
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 04/23/2021
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2021-04-26 14:31:00.0.
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 2021-04-20 09:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 04/26/2021
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 04/26/2021
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2021-04-27 12:16:00.0.
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 04/27/2021
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 04/27/2021
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2021-04-27 13:17:00.0.
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 2021-04-21 09:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 2021-04-27 09:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 04/28/2021
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 2021-04-26 09:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 04/28/2021
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/29/2021 03:58:00 PM.
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/30/2021 01:41:00 PM.
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00REMITTITUR (D077440, D077441, D077442, D077443) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 04/30/2021
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 05/03/2021
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 2021-04-28 09:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 2021-05-03 09:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 2021-05-04 09:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00DOCUMENT - OTHER (LIST OF EXHIBITS ADMITTING DURNG TRIAL) FILED BY ALLERGAN PLC ON 05/05/2021
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 05/06/2021
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2021-05-07 10:27:00.0.
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/07/2021 01:33:00 PM.
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MISCELLANEOUS HEARING 05/07/2021 03:00:00 PM.
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 2021-05-05 09:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00RESPONSE FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 05/11/2021
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 05/11/2021
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 05/11/2021
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 2021-05-10 09:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 2021-05-11 09:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 05/12/2021
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 05/13/2021
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/14/2021 08:22:00 AM.
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 05/14/2021
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 05/14/2021
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1814539 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 2021-03-19 10:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 2021-03-22 10:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 03/25/2021
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE 03/25/2021 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 03/25/2021
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 03/25/2021
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 03/25/2021
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/26/2021
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1814653 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1822164 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2986159 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41164817 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3982945 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3982877 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3992520 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1814659 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3982935 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2986158 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/30/2021
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2986137 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41160855 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 03/30/2021
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00REPLY TO MOTION FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 04/01/2021
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/01/2021
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 04/01/2021 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 04/02/2021
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/05/2021
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 04/02/2021
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 04/02/2021
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE 2021-04-02 10:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 05/17/2021
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2021-05-17 09:56:00.0.
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 2021-05-12 09:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 2021-05-17 09:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 2021-05-18 09:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 2021-05-19 09:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/20/2021 09:46:00 AM.
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/21/2021 09:34:00 AM.
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/20/2021 10:07:00 AM.
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 05/20/2021
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 05/21/2021 10:07:00 AM.
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 05/21/2021
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 05/21/2021
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 05/21/2021
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2021-05-25 07:38:00.0.
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 2021-05-24 13:30:00.0.
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLERGAN PLC ON 05/25/2021
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00STIPULATION - OTHER FILED BY ALLERGAN PLC ON 05/25/2021
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/27/2021 11:25:00 AM.
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2021-05-27 08:25:00.0.
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 2021-05-25 09:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00RESPONSE FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 05/28/2021
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 2021-06-01 13:30:00.0.
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY ALLERGAN PLC ON 06/03/2021
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/03/2021
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLERGAN PLC ON 06/03/2021
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 2021-06-02 09:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. ON 06/03/2021
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY WATSON LABORATORIES, INC. ON 06/03/2021
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION (FOR JUDGMENT) FILED BY ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. ON 06/03/2021
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION (FOR JUDGMENT) FILED BY WATSON LABORATORIES, INC. ON 06/03/2021
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41203423 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/10/2021 09:14:00 AM.
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF COSTS ON APPEAL FILED BY CALIFORNIA STATE BOARD OF PHARMACY ON 06/09/2021
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 04/21/2021
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE 2021-04-14 10:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/23/2021 12:31:00 PM.
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 2021-04-19 09:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2021-04-23 12:40:00.0.
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF COSTS ON APPEAL FILED BY MEDICAL BOARD OF CALIFORNIA ON 06/10/2021
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ALLERGAN PLC ON 06/07/2021
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED BY CEPHALON, INC. ON 06/04/2021
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 06/04/2021
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING (CUSTODIAL AFFIDAVITS) FILED BY JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 07/06/2021
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLERGAN PLC ON 06/28/2021
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ALLERGAN PLC ON 06/28/2021
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00EXHIBIT LIST (ADMITTED DURING TRIAL ON 6-28-21) FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 06/28/2021
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 06/29/2021
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 2021-07-06 09:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2021-07-08 10:37:00.0.
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2021-07-08 10:30:00.0.
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 07/08/2021
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2021-07-08 13:43:00.0.
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2021-07-08 15:39:00.0.
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2021-07-08 14:03:00.0.
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/29/2021
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/29/2021
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 2021-06-28 09:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 2021-06-30 09:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 06/29/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC; CEPHALON, INC.; TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ON 07/12/2021
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC.; JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 07/09/2021
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC.; JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 07/12/2021
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2021-07-01 14:19:00.0.
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2021-07-13 07:52:00.0.
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 07/01/2021
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2021-07-02 11:55:00.0.
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 07/14/2021
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2021-07-19 14:35:00.0.
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2021-07-19 15:09:00.0.
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/02/2021
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 07/06/2021
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2021-07-08 11:51:00.0.
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 05/17/2021
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2021-07-08 11:21:00.0.
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2021-07-23 14:20:00.0.
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY CEPHALON, INC.; TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ON 07/23/2021
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/26/2021 01:37:00 PM.
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 07/26/2021
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC; CEPHALON, INC.; TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ON 07/27/2021
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 07/26/2021
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC; CEPHALON, INC.; TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ON 07/27/2021
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00RESPONSE FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC. ON 07/26/2021
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 2021-07-21 09:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 07/27/2021
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/30/2021 01:19:00 PM.
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/29/2021 09:21:00 AM.
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/10/2021 08:50:00 AM.
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 2021-07-27 09:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 2021-07-26 09:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 08/17/2021
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/17/2021
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/17/2021 09:40:00 AM.
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 08/18/2021 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00JOINT STATEMENT FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 08/17/2021
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00REQUEST - OTHER RECEIVED ON 08/25/2021.
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/27/2021 11:28:00 AM.
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00REMITTITUR (D077794) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 08/19/2021
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/30/2021
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/30/2021 02:39:00 PM.
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/31/2021
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41234940 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY (ATMOTION PRO HAC VICE) FILED BY ALLERGAN PLC ON 08/30/2021
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/31/2021 09:28:00 AM.
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 08/31/2021 11:08:00 AM.
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/10/2021 02:29:00 PM.
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00CORRESPONDENCE SUBMITTED BY PURDUE PHARMA L.P. REJECTED ON 09/02/2021.
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY ALLERGAN PLC ON 09/13/2021
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00RESPONSE FILED BY ALLERGAN PLC ON 09/13/2021
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 06/15/2021
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 2021-06-14 09:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1854835 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21026137 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 2021-06-15 09:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 06/17/2021 01:19:00 PM.
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00OPINION D077794
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ALLERGAN PLC ON 06/25/2021
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/28/2021
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 06/25/2021
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLERGAN PLC ON 06/25/2021
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/28/2021
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 06/01/2021 08:27:00 AM.
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 06/03/2021
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 06/29/2021
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY WATSON LABORATORIES, INC. ON 06/03/2021
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. ON 06/03/2021
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 06/04/2021
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 06/03/2021
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION (FOR JUDGMENT) FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC ON 06/03/2021
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/04/2021 09:54:00 AM.
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 06/04/2021
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION (FOR JUDGMENT) FILED BY ALLERGAN PLC ON 06/03/2021
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2021-07-02 14:42:00.0.
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2021-07-02 13:40:00.0.
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2021-07-02 14:34:00.0.
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2021-07-02 13:56:00.0.
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2021-07-02 14:06:00.0.
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED BY TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ON 06/04/2021
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CEPHALON, INC. ON 06/04/2021
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY ALLERGAN PLC ON 06/03/2021
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ON 06/04/2021
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY CEPHALON, INC. ON 06/04/2021
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ON 06/04/2021
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY MEDICAL BOARD OF CALIFORNIA ON 06/09/2021
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 06/09/2021
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00DOCUMENT - OTHER (PROPOSED STATEMENT OD DECISION) FILED BY ALLERGAN PLC ON 09/13/2021
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 09/13/2021
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00RESPONSE FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC; CEPHALON, INC.; TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ON 09/14/2021
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC; CEPHALON, INC.; TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ON 09/14/2021
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC; CEPHALON, INC.; TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ON 09/14/2021
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/16/2021
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/17/2021
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC. ON 09/17/2021
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY ALLERGAN PLC ON 09/17/2021
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 09/20/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 09/20/2021
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21066640 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 09/22/2021
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/01/2021
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC; CEPHALON, INC.; TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ON 10/01/2021
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/23/2021 10:06:00 AM.
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/27/2021 08:50:00 AM.
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/27/2021 09:20:00 AM.
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 10/01/2021
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/04/2021
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 2021-10-01 09:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00JOINT STATEMENT FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 09/27/2021
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR SANCTIONS 2021-09-30 09:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 10/01/2021
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31070228 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1913218 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/02/2021 01:36:00 PM.
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00OBJECTION FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 10/04/2021
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00TENTATIVE DECISION
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 11/02/2021
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 10/29/2021
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 11/23/2021.
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/29/2021 12:11:00 PM.
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00STATEMENT OF DECISION (PROPOSED) RECEIVED ON 11/23/2021.
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/30/2021
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/30/2021
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 10/28/2021
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 11/12/2021
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/27/2021
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00JUDGMENT
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00STATEMENT OF DECISION
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/27/2021
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/14/2021 11:53:00 AM.
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/13/2022 09:23:00 AM.
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 01/14/2022
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/18/2022 04:19:00 PM.
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 01/18/2022
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/19/2022 03:01:00 PM.
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC.; JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 07/09/2021
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 07/09/2021
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC.; JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 07/12/2021
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC; CEPHALON, INC.; TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ON 07/13/2021
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC; CEPHALON, INC.; TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ON 07/14/2021
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC; CEPHALON, INC.; TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ON 07/14/2021
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2021-07-14 08:26:00.0.
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC; CEPHALON, INC.; TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ON 07/14/2021
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2021-07-16 10:13:00.0.
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2021-07-15 11:38:00.0.
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21037677 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 2021-07-12 09:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 2021-07-07 09:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 07/14/2021.
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 07/16/2021
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 07/15/2021
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 07/19/2021
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC; CEPHALON, INC.; TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ON 07/16/2021
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC; CEPHALON, INC.; TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ON 07/16/2021
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY (AS TO PAUL WEEKS) FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 07/16/2021
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 07/16/2021
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC; CEPHALON, INC.; TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ON 07/16/2021.
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 2021-07-19 09:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 07/19/2021
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2021-07-19 15:06:00.0.
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 07/20/2021
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2021-07-20 09:46:00.0.
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC; CEPHALON, INC.; TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ON 07/20/2021
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 07/21/2021
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 2021-07-20 09:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 2021-07-13 09:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 07/21/2021 08:37:00 AM.
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC; CEPHALON, INC.; TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ON 07/21/2021
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 07/21/2021
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/23/2021 08:35:00 AM.
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 07/22/2021
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2021-07-23 08:45:00.0.
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/22/2021 09:29:00 AM.
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 2021-07-14 09:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 07/23/2021
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MISCELLANEOUS HEARING 2021-07-23 11:00:00.0.
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 01/20/2022.
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ALLERGAN PLC ON 02/02/2022.
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS 2022-05-05 14:00:00.0.
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPTS/DISKS FILED D080091
Date: 2022-05-06T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1984147 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/11/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/16/2022 03:49:00 PM.
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00REMITTITUR (D080091) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 07/06/2022
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2023-07-21T00:00:00WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 10/19/2022
Date: 2022-10-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE FILED BY JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.; JOHNSON & JOHNSON ON 08/01/2022
Date: 2022-08-01T00:00:00REMITTITUR (D080091) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 07/06/2023
Date: 2023-07-06T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/06/2023 02:04:00 PM.
Date: 2023-12-06T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2023-12-19T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-08-09T00:00:00WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ALLERGAN PLC; ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 08/17/2022
Date: 2022-08-17T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/21/2023 10:24:00 AM.
Date: 2023-07-21T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS 08/04/2022 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2022-08-08T00:00:00CASE REASSIGNED TO MCCORMICK, MELISSA EFFECTIVE 09/18/2023.
Date: 2023-09-01T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/24/2023 10:55:00 AM.
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/19/2023 02:36:00 PM.
Date: 2023-12-19T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2023-12-06T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: January 08, 2024MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/23/2024 09:39:00 AM.
Date: January 23, 2024MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/08/2024 12:10:00 PM.
Date: 2024-01-08T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: January 23, 2024RESPONSE FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 09/13/2021
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE, LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 02/03/2022
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE 2022-02-03 14:00:00.0.
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/10/2022
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/10/2022
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00NOTICE OF DEFAULT - G061130
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/25/2022
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00RECEIPT FOR RECORDS AND PAPERS G061130
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/25/2022
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00NOTICE OF DEFAULT - G061130
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00NOTICE OF MAILING REGISTER OF ACTIONS - G061130
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00NOTICE OF CASE TRANSFER - G061130, D080091
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED BY ALLERGAN PLC; ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 03/07/2022
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00NOTICE OF DEFAULT - D080091
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 03/10/2022 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) (SECOND AMENDED) FILED BY ALLERGAN PLC ON 03/16/2022
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31130814 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 03/18/2022.
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ACTAVIS LLC; CEPHALON, INC.; TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ON 03/21/2022.
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL - D080091
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE, LLC; ALLERGAN PLC ON 03/23/2022
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE 03/24/2022 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41313682 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00AMENDED NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL D080091
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 04/11/2022
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 04/11/2022
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 04/11/2022
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00ORDER - D080091
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY ALLERGAN PLC; ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC ON 04/29/2022
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 05/03/2022
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/03/2022
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.