Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Klich, Jerry, Klich, Wasana, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Hoke, Curtis G, against Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Syngenta Ag, Syngenta Crop Protection, Llc, represented by Levin, Jason, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior with Charles S. Treat presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2023 |
Category40: Unlimited Mass Tort-Efile |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
*Case Management Conference
Date: January 30, 2024Notice of/to:
Date: November 27, 2023Answer/Response/Denial - No Fee
Date: November 03, 2023Original Summons Issued/Filed
Date: September 27, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2024 |
CMC Notice - Fast Track *Case Management Conference Judge: Treat, Charles S |
||
November 30, 2023 | Notes | ||
November 27, 2023 |
Notice of/to: Submission of Coordination Add On Petition w/ JCCP 5031 Notice of/to: |
||
November 03, 2023 |
Answer/Response/Denial of Chevron to Complaint Answer/Response/Denial - No Fee |
||
November 03, 2023 | Notes | ||
September 27, 2023 | Original Summons Issued/Filed | ||
September 27, 2023 | Service of Complaint and Summons | ||
September 27, 2023 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
September 27, 2023 | Fee Paid | ||
September 27, 2023 | Initial Complaint Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.