Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Ia American Life Insurance Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Akopyan, Hilda A, against Does 1 Through 10, Feliciano, Connie L., Salazar Rodrin, Mirasol, represented by Fogel, Joseph S., in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior with Danielle K. Douglas presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 21, 2023 |
Category37: Unlimited Other Contract-Efile |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2024 |
*Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Douglas, Danielle K |
||
December 22, 2023 | E-Filing Rejection | ||
December 13, 2023 |
Answer by Zenaida Santos to Cross Complaint Answer/Response/Denial - Unlimited |
||
December 13, 2023 |
Answer of by Mirasol Salazar Rodrin to Cross Complaint Answer/Response/Denial - No Fee |
||
November 03, 2023 |
Notice of Continuance *Case Management Conference Judge: Douglas, Danielle K |
||
October 27, 2023 |
Notice of Posting Jury Fees Recvd Notice of/to: |
||
October 02, 2023 |
Summons Issued/Filed on Cross-Complaint Summons Issued/Filed |
||
August 21, 2023 |
Cross Complaint Filed by Connie L. Feliciano Cross Complaint Filed |
||
August 21, 2023 |
Answer by Connie L. Feliciano to Complaint Answer/Response/Denial - Unlimited |
||
August 21, 2023 | Notes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.