Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Gamaza, Hailey, filed a(n) 22: Unlimited Auto-Efile case represented by Taguchi, Kevin D., against Does 1-10, Ming, Ya Meng, represented by Hurley, Beth, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior with Terri A. Mockler presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 21, 2023 |
Category22: Unlimited Auto-Efile |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Initial Complaint Filed
Date: June 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2024 |
*Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Mockler, Terri |
||
December 11, 2023 |
CMC Notice - Fast Track *Case Management Conference Judge: Fannin, Jill C |
||
November 22, 2023 |
Case Management Conference Statement Filed by Ya Meng Ming, 12/11/23 Case Management Conference Statement Filed |
||
November 16, 2023 |
Case Management Conference Statement Filed by Hailey Gamaza, 12/11/23 Case Management Conference Statement Filed |
||
August 24, 2023 |
General Denial From: Ya Meng Ming Answer/Response/Denial - Unlimited |
||
August 24, 2023 |
Notice of Posting Jury Fees Notice of/to: |
||
August 24, 2023 | Notes | ||
June 21, 2023 | Summons Issued/Filed | ||
June 21, 2023 | Service of Complaint and Summons | ||
June 21, 2023 | Initial Complaint Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.