Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bankers Healthcare Group, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Weiner, Richard L, against Cisse, Amy, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior with Danielle K. Douglas presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 06, 2023 |
Category09: Unlimited Other Collections-Efile |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2024 | Notes | ||
December 26, 2023 |
PROPOSED STIPULATION & ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREDJ PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 664.6 Lodge Order/Judgment |
||
October 05, 2023 |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Douglas, Danielle K |
||
July 21, 2023 |
Notice of Conditional Settlement of the Entire Case Filed by Plaintiff, Bankers Healthcare Group, Notice of Conditional Settlement of the Entire Case Filed |
||
June 28, 2023 | Proof of Service of Summons | ||
June 20, 2023 |
NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Notice of/to: |
||
June 06, 2023 | Service of Complaint and Summons | ||
June 06, 2023 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
June 06, 2023 | Summons Issued/Filed | ||
June 06, 2023 | Initial Complaint Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.