Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Ford, Janice, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Goins, Vernon C, against Does 1-50, Inclusive, Ford, Jermaine, represented by Toth, Matthew S., in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior with Fannin, Jill C presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 11, 2023 |
Category16: Unlimited Fraud-Efile |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
*Case Management Conference
Date: September 11, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 11, 2023Initial Complaint Filed
Date: May 11, 2023Summons Issued/Filed
Date: May 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2024 |
Hearing on Demurrer to:
Judge: Mockler, Terri |
||
January 23, 2024 |
*Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Mockler, Terri |
||
January 08, 2024 | Notice of Conditional Settlement of the Entire Case Filed | ||
January 03, 2024 |
REQ FOR JN ISO DEMURRER Request for Judicial Notice Filed |
||
January 03, 2024 |
DEC OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY RE MEET AND CONFER Declaration of |
||
January 03, 2024 |
MOTION FOR DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF JANICE FORD Demurrer to Complaint |
||
December 15, 2023 | Service of Amended Complaint | ||
December 15, 2023 |
First Amended Complaint Amended Complaint Filed |
||
December 14, 2023 | E-Filing Rejection | ||
December 13, 2023 |
Minutes Hearing on Demurrer to: Judge: Fannin, Jill C |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.