Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Bonderer, Jesse Lee, filed a(n) 22: Unlimited Auto-Efile case represented by Um, Allen, Esq., against Adams, Charles, Does 1 To 50 Inclusive, represented by Patterson, Keith E., in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior with Maier, Clare presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 10, 2023 |
Category22: Unlimited Auto-Efile |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: September 29, 2023Notice of Unconditional Settlement of Entire Case Filed
Date: December 11, 2023Notice of Change of Address
Date: November 17, 2023*Case Management Conference
Date: October 18, 2023Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: October 05, 2023Notice of/to:
Date: July 27, 2023Demand for Jury Trial
Date: May 15, 2023Summons Issued/Filed
Date: May 10, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 10, 2023Initial Complaint Filed
Date: May 10, 2023Summons Issued/Filed
Date: May 10, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 10, 2023Initial Complaint Filed
Date: May 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2024 |
*Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Treat, Charles S |
||
December 11, 2023 | Notice of Unconditional Settlement of Entire Case Filed | ||
November 17, 2023 |
Notice of Change of Address and Firm Name for Def Charles Adams Attorney Notice of Change of Address |
||
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minutes *Case Management Conference Judge: Maier, Clare |
|
October 05, 2023 |
Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Jesse Lee Bonder, 10/18/23 Case Management Conference Statement Filed |
||
September 29, 2023 |
Case Management Conference Statement Filed by Charles Adams Case Management Conference Statement Filed |
||
July 27, 2023 |
Defendants Notice of Posting Jury Fees Recvd Notice of/to: |
||
July 27, 2023 |
Answer by Charles Adams to Complaint Answer/Response/Denial - Unlimited |
||
July 27, 2023 | Notes | ||
July 07, 2023 |
Proof of Service as to CHARLES ADAMS on 06/29/23 by Sub Ser Proof of Service of Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.