Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Reese, Helen S., Reese, John G., filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Kapoor, Sunita, against Does 1 Through 20, Hagar, Amanda E., represented by Terreri, Herbert L, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior with Douglas, Danielle K presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 08, 2023 |
Category16: Unlimited Fraud-Efile |
Last RefreshedMarch 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
*Case Management Conference
Date: September 05, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 08, 2023Original Summons Issued/Filed
Date: May 08, 2023Initial Complaint Filed
Date: May 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2024 |
*Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Douglas, Danielle K |
||
March 01, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | C23-01084 CASE NAME: HELEN REESE VS. AMANDA HAGAR HEARING ON DEMURRER TO: COMPLAINT FILED BY: REESE, HELEN S. *TENTATIVE RULING:* The demurrer is overruled. The Reeses shall file their answer to the U... | |
January 18, 2024 |
Minutes *Further Case Management Conference Judge: Douglas, Danielle K |
||
January 16, 2024 | Case Management Conference Statement Filed | ||
January 02, 2024 |
Case Management Conference Statement Filed by Amanda E Hagar, 1/18/24 Case Management Conference Statement Filed |
||
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minutes *Case Management Conference Judge: Douglas, Danielle K |
|
September 01, 2023 |
Notice of Entry of Order Notice of Entry of: |
||
September 01, 2023 | *Order on Fee Waiver Granted | ||
September 01, 2023 |
Order After Hearing on motion to expunge lis pendens Order After Hearing |
||
September 01, 2023 |
Minutes Special Set Hearing Judge: Douglas, Danielle K |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.